EP3852789 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER WITH DUOCARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lentigen Technology, Inc. 910 Clopper Road, Suite 200 South Building Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ORENTAS, Rimas J. 209 13th Ave. E Unit B Seattle, Washington 98102 / US | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Dina 7923 Inverness Ridge Road Potomac, Maryland 20854 / US | 03 /
HASO, Waleed M. 1459 Chandler Drive Fair Lawn, New Jersey 07410 / US | 04 /
MILTENYI, Stefan Friedrich-Ebert Strasse 68 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 05 /
DROPULIC, Boro 12637 Golden Oak Drive Ellicott City, Maryland 21042 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19790096.2 | 18.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019US51734 | Priority number, date | US201816134735 | 18.09.2018 Original published format: US201816134735 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020061194 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3852789 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
A61K39/0011 (CN);
A61K35/17 (CN,US);
A61K39/001112 (US);
A61K39/001124 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4631 (EP);
A61K39/464412 (EP);
A61K39/464413 (EP);
A61K39/464424 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,CN);
A61P35/02 (EP,CN,US);
C07K14/70517 (EP,US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K14/70578 (EP,US);
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/2827 (EP);
C07K16/2887 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (US);
C12N15/86 (EP);
A61K2039/5156 (CN,US);
A61K2039/804 (EP,CN);
A61K2239/48 (EP);
C07K2317/31 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/02 (EP,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP);
C07K2319/75 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16043 (EP);
C12N2740/16071 (EP);
C12N2800/40 (EP);
C12N2840/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS MIT DUOCARS | [2021/30] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR TREATING CANCER WITH DUOCARS | [2021/30] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET MÉTHODES POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER AVEC DES DUOCARS | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 14.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2018045325 (LENTIGEN TECH INC [US]); | by applicant | US79645667 | US498298 | FR901228 | US3060165 | US3896111 | US4137230 | US4151042 | US4235871 | US4248870 | US4256746 | US4260608 | US4265814 | US4294757 | US4307016 | US4308268 | US4308269 | US4309428 | US4313946 | US4315929 | US4317821 | US4322348 | US4331598 | US4361650 | US4362663 | US4364866 | US4371533 | US4424219 | US4450254 | US4486414 | US4501728 | US4689401 | US4816444 | US4837028 | US4879278 | US4880935 | US4902505 | US4957735 | US4978744 | US4986988 | US5004697 | EP0425235 | US5019369 | US5055303 | US5076973 | US5079163 | US5122368 | US5138036 | US5188837 | US5208020 | US5208021 | US5254342 | US5268164 | US5271961 | US5410024 | US5413797 | US5416064 | US5449752 | US5504191 | US5506206 | US5514670 | US5521284 | US5530097 | US5534496 | US5554725 | US5599902 | US5622929 | US5635483 | US5663149 | US5665860 | US5780588 | US5792458 | US5824805 | US6034065 | US6214345 | US6239104 | US6323315 | US6441163 | US2002197266 | WO2004010957 | US6884869 | US2005238649 | US2006024317 | US2006074008 | US7338929 | US2011070248 | US2011212088 | WO2012079000 | US2012213783 | WO2013126726 |