EP3880330 - A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ONE OR MORE LIGHTING DEVICES AND A METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.08.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.07.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Signify Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 48 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALIAKSEYEU, Dzmitry, Viktorovich c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MAGIELSE, Remco c/o High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Verweij, Petronella Daniëlle Signify Netherlands B.V. Intellectual Property High Tech Campus 7 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19790559.9 | 28.10.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP79409 | Priority number, date | EP20180205648 | 12.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18205648 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020099110 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880330 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A63J17/00, H05B45/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
H05B45/20 (EP);
H05B47/155 (EP,US);
Y02B20/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ODER MEHRERER BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/38] | English: | A CONTROL SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING ONE OR MORE LIGHTING DEVICES AND A METHOD THEREOF | [2021/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR COMMANDER UN OU PLUSIEURS DISPOSITIFS D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ CORRESPONDANT | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/38] | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR COMMANDER UN OU PLUSIEURS DISPOSITIFS D'ÉCLAIRAGE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.07.2024 | 03.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 28.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO03015477 (MARTIN PROFESSIONAL AS [DK], et al); | [XYI]WO2018052572 (KETRA INC [US]) |