EP3863854 - CEMENT-BASED DIRECT INK FOR 3D PRINTING OF COMPLEX ARCHITECTED STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.07.2023 [2023/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | For all designated states William Marsh Rice University 6100 Main Street Houston, TX 77005 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAHMAN, Muhammad M. 6100 Main Street MS 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | 02 /
SAJADI, Seyed Mohammad 6100 Main Street MS 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | 03 /
KUMAR, Ashok 6100 Main Street MS 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | 04 /
BOUL, Peter J. To Allen Center 1200 Smith St. 27th Floor Houston, TX 77002 / US | 05 /
THAEMLITZ, Carl To Allen Center 1200 Smith St. 27th Floor Houston, TX 77002 / US | 06 /
AJAYAN, Pulickel M. 6100 Main Street MS 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/33] | 01 /
RAHMAN, Muhammad, M. 6100 Main Street, MS 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | ||
02 /
SAJADI, Seyed, Mohammad 6100 Main Street, MS 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | |||
03 /
KUMAR, Ashok 6100 Main Street, Ms 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | |||
04 /
BOUL, Peter, J. To Allen Center 1200 Smith St., 27th Floor Houston, TX 77002 / US | |||
05 /
THAEMLITZ, Carl To Allen Center 1200 Smith St., 27th Floor Houston, TX 77002 / US | |||
06 /
AJAYAN, Pulickel, M. 6100 Main Street, MS 325 Houston, TX 77030 / US | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Dauncey, Mark Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 19791426.0 | 07.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US55039 | Priority number, date | US201862742706P | 08.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862742706 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020076724 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863854 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y70/10, B33Y70/00, C09D11/322, C09D11/38, B29C64/112, C04B28/00 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
C09D11/322 (EP);
C04B7/02 (US);
B28B1/001 (US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/10 (EP);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
C04B14/104 (US);
C04B16/02 (US);
C04B24/2641 (US);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C09D11/38 (EP);
B29C64/112 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B28/04, C04B14/104, C04B24/02, C04B24/2647, C04B24/383 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B14/10, C04B20/008, C04B24/383, C04B2103/32, C04B2103/50 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | DIREKTTINTE AUF DER BASIS VON ZEMENT ZUM 3D-DRUCKEN KOMPLEXER UND KOMPLIZIERTER STRUKTUREN | [2021/33] | English: | CEMENT-BASED DIRECT INK FOR 3D PRINTING OF COMPLEX ARCHITECTED STRUCTURES | [2021/33] | French: | ENCRE DIRECTE À BASE DE CIMENT POUR IMPRESSION 3D DE STRUCTURES ARCHITECTURÉES COMPLEXES | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 05.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/28] | 21.02.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1491516 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [A] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [A]US2011177188 (BREDT JAMES F [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [A]CN102924019 (BEIJING BUILDING MATERIALS ACADEMY SCIENCES RES) [A] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [A]CN107311561 (UNIV TONGJI) [A] 1-22* example -; claim - *; | [A]EP3260258 (HOLCIM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [A] 1-22 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO2018083010 (SIKA TECH AG [CH]) [A] 1-22 * example -; claim - * |