EP3677628 - SUPERABSORBENT POLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Jin Woo LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Youngsam LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/28] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2020/28] | Application number, filing date | 19791774.3 | 09.01.2019 | [2020/28] | WO2019KR00352 | Priority number, date | KR20180049252 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180049252 | [2020/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208905 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3677628 | Date: | 08.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/20, C08K5/09, C08K5/54, C08L33/00, C08J3/24, A61L15/20, C08F2/10, C08J3/075, C08J3/12, A61L15/34, A61L15/46, A61L15/60 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C08J3/075 (EP);
C08L33/02 (US);
A61L15/20 (EP);
A61L15/34 (EP);
A61L15/44 (EP);
A61L15/46 (EP);
A61L15/60 (EP);
B01J20/267 (US);
C08J3/12 (EP);
C08J3/24 (EP);
C08J3/245 (EP,US);
C08K3/34 (EP,US);
C08K5/0058 (US);
C08K5/09 (EP);
C08K5/092 (US);
C08K5/175 (US);
A61L2300/404 (EP);
B01J2220/68 (US);
C08K2201/005 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61L15/60, C08L33/04 (EP);
C08K3/34, C08L33/02 (EP);
C08K5/09, C08L33/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/28] | C08K5/00, C08K5/20, C08K5/09, C08K5/54, C08L33/00, C08J3/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/28] | Title | German: | SUPERABSORBIERENDE POLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/28] | English: | SUPERABSORBENT POLYMER COMPOSITION | [2020/28] | French: | COMPOSITION POLYMÈRE SUPER-ABSORBANTE | [2020/28] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2020 | Translation filed | 31.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/28] | 23.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9730109 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, lines 2-5 * * page 8, lines 5-12 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 27 * * page 13 - page 18; examples 1-4; tables 1-4 * * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]US2006025731 (COHEN RICHMOND R [US]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 1-2 * * page 3, paragraphs 42, 46 ** page 7, paragraph 72 - page 9, paragraph 96; examples 1-8; claims 1-71; tables 1-8 *; | [IY]WO2009006377 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 1, lines 5-7 * * page 1, lines 23-33 * * page 2, line 5- - page 3, line 32 * * page 5, lines 13-16 * * page 6, line 27 - page 7, line 6 * * page 10, line 4 - page 13, line 32 * * page 14, lines 22-29 * * page 17 - page 44; examples 1-27; tables 1-32 * * claims 1-12 * [Y] 1-15 | International search | [A]JPH0852203 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-13; | [A]JPH11172129 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-13; | [A]JP2003500556 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES COMPANY) [A] 1-13; | [A]KR20170075624 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR])[A] 1-13; | [A]KR20170136371 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-13 | by applicant | KR20180049252 | WO2019KR00352 |