EP3780495 - MODEL UPDATING METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Zhongyao Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
CHI, Qinghua Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
XU, Yixu Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19791815.4 | 24.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN84148 | Priority number, date | CN201810393730 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810393730 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206196 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780495 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
H04L67/30 (EP);
G06F16/23 (CN);
H04L41/145 (EP,US);
G06F16/2228 (CN);
G06F18/214 (CN);
H04L41/0893 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, VORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR MODELLAKTUALISIERUNG | [2021/07] | English: | MODEL UPDATING METHOD, DEVICE, AND SYSTEM | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE À JOUR DE MODÈLE, DISPOSITIF, ET SYSTÈME | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | Translation filed | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 15.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6058260 (BROCKEL KENNETH H [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 4, line 14 - column 15, line 38 *; | [A]GB2539977 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB])[A] 1-15; | [I]US2018032908 (NAGARAJU PRADEEP B [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * Storing of a model and comparison to a new one.; page 7, line 19 - page 8, line 17; figure -; claim - *; | [X] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Discussion on big data and 5G", vol. SA WG2, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20180122 - 20180126, (20180126), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-181250_WAS_1230_WAS_0861_WAS_0212_DISCUSSION ON BIG DATA AND 5G-R1, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPO, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fsa/WG2%5FArch/TSGS2%5F125%5FGothenburg/Docs/, (20180126), XP051390352 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [A]CN102244679 (UNIV NANJING POSTS & TELECOMM) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A]CN102339390 (TIANJIN TAAN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A]US8140589 (PETRI JOHN EDWARD [US]) [A] 1-30* entire document *; | [XA]CN102571400 (CHINA MOBILE GROUP DESIGN INST) [X] 1, 2, 6, 15, 16, 20, 29, 30 * description, paragraphs [0008] and [0042]-[0073] * [A] 3-5, 7-14, 17-19, 21-28; | [A]CN106599836 (BEIJING ATHENA EYES SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * entire document * |