EP3785514 - WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kubota Corporation 1-2-47 Shikitsuhigashi Naniwa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 556-8601 / JP | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANE, Masaru c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 02 /
YAGYU, Sumio c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Takao c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 04 /
YAMANAKA, Yukifumi c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | 05 /
TAKAKI, Go c/o Kubota Corporation Sakai Seizosho, 64, Ishizukitamachi Sakai-ku Sakai-shi, Osaka 590-0823 / JP | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19792078.8 | 26.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019JP18092 | Priority number, date | JP20180087253 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018087253 | [2021/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208819 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785514 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3785514 | Date: | 13.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01C19/02, A01C7/08, A01B71/06, H02K47/14, A01C17/00, H02P9/48, H02K16/00, H02K7/18, H02J7/16, H02J7/14 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
A01C17/005 (EP);
H02P9/02 (US);
A01B71/06 (EP);
A01C19/02 (EP);
H02J4/00 (US);
H02J7/1492 (EP);
H02J7/16 (EP);
H02K16/00 (EP);
H02K7/1815 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/04] | A01C19/02, A01C7/08, A01B71/06, H02K47/14 | ||
Former IPC [2021/09] | A01C19/02, A01C7/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSMASCHINE | [2021/09] | English: | WORKING MACHINE | [2021/09] | French: | MACHINE DE TRAVAIL | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2020 | Translation filed | 30.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 27.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 13.03.2024 | ES | 13.03.2024 | FI | 13.03.2024 | HR | 13.03.2024 | LT | 13.03.2024 | LV | 13.03.2024 | NL | 13.03.2024 | SE | 13.03.2024 | NO | 13.06.2024 | RS | 13.06.2024 | GR | 14.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
SE | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/36] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
LV | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
ES | 13.03.2024 | ||
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 13.03.2024 | |
FI | 13.03.2024 | ||
HR | 13.03.2024 | ||
LT | 13.03.2024 | ||
NO | 13.06.2024 | ||
RS | 13.06.2024 | ||
GR | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 13.03.2024 | |
NO | 13.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]GB2397563 (WALTERSCHEID GMBH GKN [DE]) [I] 1,8-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 4 - line 16 * * page 4, line 2 - line 9 * * page 5, line 1 - line 20 * * page 6, line 3 - line 14 * * figure -; claim - * [A] 2-7; | [A]US2005046395 (AOYAMA TORU [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract ** figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2013043838 (TSUCHIYA HISATOSHI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]RU2550867 (OOO NPP REZONANS [RU]) [A] 1,8-10 * abstract * * page 5, line 6 - line 36 * * page 8, line 13 - line 20 * * figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]US4306402 (WHIMP RAYMOND G) [A] 1-10* , *; | [A]WO2017030034 (PRODRONE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-10 * , . *; | [A]JP6214806B [A] 1-10 * , * | by applicant | JPS6214806B |