EP3784839 - TOOL AND METHOD FOR FORMING PILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.09.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PPX Technology Pty Ltd 34 Osanna Street Daisy Hill, Queensland 4127 / AU | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZAKRZEWSKI, Przemyslaw Adam 34 Osanna Street Daisy Hill, Queensland 4127 / AU | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | K2 IP Limited c/o Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Sanger, Phillip Simon Vault IP Limited Cavendish House Waterloo Street Birmingham B2 5PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 19792576.1 | 23.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019AU50359 | Priority number, date | AU20180901373 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: AU 2018901373 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019204866 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784839 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/44, E02D7/22, E02D15/04, E02D5/66 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
E02D5/44 (EP,AU,US);
E02D7/22 (EP,AU,US);
E02D15/04 (AU);
E02D5/665 (EP,US);
E02D5/66 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | E02D5/44, E02D7/22, E02D15/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON STAPELN | [2021/09] | English: | TOOL AND METHOD FOR FORMING PILES | [2021/09] | French: | OUTIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE PILIERS | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 28.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0517329 (LABRUE JEAN MARIE [FR]); | [IA]EP0853162 (HERRERO CODINA JUAN VICENTE [ES]); | [A]DE19935813 (SCHORR CLAUS PETER [DE]); | [IA]EP2685006 (SOLETANCHE FREYSSINET [FR]) | International search | [X]US6079906 (HERRERO CODINA JUAN VICENTE [ES]); | [A]US7591329 (PERPEZAT DANIEL [FR], et al); | [X]GB2503918 (SOLETANCHE FREYSSINET [FR]) | by applicant | EP0517329 | EP0853162 | EP2685006 |