EP3780879 - COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Jing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
HAN, Lifeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
DAI, Mingzeng Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/07] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19792917.7 | 26.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN84689 | Priority number, date | CN201810404964 | 28.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810404964 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206314 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780879 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/11, H04W28/24, H04W76/16 | [2021/23] | CPC: |
H04W84/047 (EP);
H04W28/24 (CN);
H04W28/0263 (US);
H04W28/0268 (US);
H04W28/22 (US);
H04W76/11 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04W76/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/07] | English: | COMMUNICATION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2020 | Translation filed | 03.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 08.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2014036762 (AL-SHALASH MAZIN [US]) [Y] 1-3,6,8-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0027]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]CN104717717 (CHINA TELECOM CO LTD ) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y] - ERICSSON ET AL, "TP to internal TR on relay architecture options", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-095336_TP_TO_INTERNAL_TR_ON_RELAY_ARCHITECTURE_OPTIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090824), no. Shanghai; 20091109, XP050399698 [Y] 1-3,6,8-15 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]WO2018029578 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al)[A] 1-19; | [A]WO2018044358 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1-19; | [A] - KDDI Corporation, "Consideration on NSA operation in architectures, la, 1b and 2a", 3GPP TSG RAN WG2 #101bis R2-1806198, (20180420), XP051435803 [A] 1-19 * , * | [A] - HUAWEI, "Overview on Support of IAB", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG3#99 R3-180815, (20180302), XP051401228 [A] 1-19 * , * | [A] - "Study on Integrated Access and Backhaul (Release 15)", 3GPP TR 38. 874 V0.1.0, (20180228), XP051392940 [A] 1-19 * , * | [A] - "Overall description Stage 2 (Release 15)", 3GPP TS 36. 300 V15.1.0, (20180331), XP051450927 [A] 1-19 * , * |