EP3780792 - SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, CENTRAL ACCESS POINT (AP) AND RADIO REMOTE UNIT (RRU) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAN, Dongcheng Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WEI, Hanyu Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HU, Yinliang Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [2021/07] | Application number, filing date | 19793015.9 | 28.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019CN84727 | Priority number, date | CN201810400404 | 28.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810400404 | [2021/07] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206320 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3780792 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3780792 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02, // H04W88/08 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H04W88/085 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W28/0205 (KR);
H04W24/08 (CN,KR);
H04W28/065 (KR);
H04W68/02 (EP,CN,KR);
H04W92/10 (KR);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/23] | H04W68/02, H04W88/08, H04W28/06 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04W68/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN, ZENTRALER ZUGANGSPUNKT (AP) UND RADIO REMOTE UNIT (RRU) | [2021/07] | English: | SIGNAL TRANSMISSION METHOD, CENTRAL ACCESS POINT (AP) AND RADIO REMOTE UNIT (RRU) | [2021/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉMISSION DE SIGNAL, POINT D'ACCÈS CENTRAL (AP) ET UNITÉ RADIO DISTANTE (RRU) | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | Translation filed | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | NL | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NL | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 26.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1827036 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013048526 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 2 and 6-8 and corresponding parts of the description *; | [XI]EP2658138 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0051] - [0054] - [0 75] , [0077] , [0079] , [0087] , [0095] * * paragraphs [0097] - [0099] - [0101] , [0136] , [0146] - [0160] * [I] 3-7,11-15; | [XAI]WO2014180339 (CHINA MOBILE COMM CORP [CN]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0 40] - [0041] - [0 51] , [0 79] - [0089] - [0 99] , [ 102] - [0104] - [ 122] - [0124] * * paragraphs [0127] - [0128] - [ 131] , [ 134] - [0135] - [ 137] , [ 139] * [A] 3,11 [I] 4-7,12-15; | [XI]WO2017088911 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M (PUBL) [SE]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * page 1, line 10 - line 26 * * page 2, line 5 - line 21 * * page 4, line 27 - line 36 * * page 8, line 10 - line 27 * * page 9, line 1 - line 9 * * page 21, line 29 - line 30 * [I] 3-7,11-15; | [A]US2018103487 (ASTERJADHI ALFRED [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0046] , [0 50] , [0 79] - [0080] *; | [A] - LAN/MAN STANDARDS COMMITTEE OF THE IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, "Part 11: Wireless LAN Medium Access Control (MAC) and Physical Layer (PHY) Specifications", vol. 802.11md drafts; 802.11 drafts; 802.11m drafts, no. D1.0, (20180204), pages 1 - 4226, IEEE DRAFT; DRAFT P802.11REVMD_D1.0, IEEE-SA, PISCATAWAY, NJ USA, URL: www.ieee802.org/11/private/Draft_Standards/11md/Draft P802.11REVmd_D1.0.pdf, (20180204), XP068137845 [A] 1-15 * sections 9.2.4-9.2.4.5.3 and 10.31 * | International search | [A]US2008165875 (MUNDARATH JAYAKRISHNAN C [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A]CN102625248 (NUFRONT SOFTWARE TECH BEIJING) [A] 1-30 * entire document *; | [A]US2013157676 (BAEK SEUNG KWON [KR], et al) [A] 1-30* entire document *; | [A]CN107295586 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * entire document * |