EP3754503 - ALLOCATION SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MACHINE LEARNING, AND COMPUTER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cambricon Technologies Corporation Limited Suite 644, Scientific Research Building No. 6, Kexueyuan South Road Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2020/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MENG, Xiaofu Room 644, Scientific Research Complex Building, No.6 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 02 /
SUN, Yongzhe Room 644, Scientific Research Complex Building, No.6 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | 03 /
DU, Zidong Room 644, Scientific Research Complex Building, No.6 Kexueyuan South Road, Haidian District Beijing 100190 / CN | [2020/52] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/52] | Application number, filing date | 19793238.7 | 24.04.2019 | [2020/52] | WO2019CN84101 | Priority number, date | CN201810372801 | 24.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810372801 | [2020/52] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019206184 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3754503 | Date: | 23.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, G06F9/50, G06N20/00, G06N3/10 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
G06N3/10 (EP,US);
G06F9/5027 (CN);
G06F9/505 (US);
G06F9/5072 (US);
G06N3/04 (US);
G06F2209/5019 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G06F9/54, G06F9/50, G06N20/00 | ||
Former IPC [2020/52] | G06F9/54 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/52] | Title | German: | ZUWEISUNGSSYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR MASCHINELLES LERNEN UND COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG | [2020/52] | English: | ALLOCATION SYSTEM, METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MACHINE LEARNING, AND COMPUTER DEVICE | [2020/52] | French: | SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ATTRIBUTION POUR APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE, ET DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE | [2020/52] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2020 | Translation filed | 15.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/52] | 17.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP3126978 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC [US]); | [A]WO2017176356 (UNIV RICE WILLIAM M [US]); | [A]CN107783840 (FUZHOU ROCKCHIP ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | International search | [A]CN102930661 (INSPUR SOFTWARE INDUSTRY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]CN103095813 (VIA TECH INC) [A] 1-21* entire document *; | [X]CN106164869 (MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING LLC) [X] 1-21 * description, paragraphs [0041]-[0048], [0102], and [0103] * |