EP3785882 - POLYAMIDE MATERIAL FOR 3D PRINTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANO Akiko c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
TANIGUCHI Kouichirou c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
MUTA Takatoshi c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19793389.8 | 25.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019JP17812 | Priority number, date | JP20180085201 | 26.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018085201 | [2021/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208741 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785882 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B29C64/118, B29C64/259, B33Y30/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y80/00, C08G69/14, C08G69/26 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
C08G69/265 (EP);
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
B29C64/118 (EP,US);
B29C64/259 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US);
C08G69/14 (EP);
C08G69/26 (EP);
C08L77/02 (EP);
C09D11/102 (EP);
D01F6/90 (EP);
B29K2077/00 (US);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/025 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L77/02, C08L77/06 (EP);
C08L77/06, C08L77/06 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/09] | B29C64/118, B29C64/259, B33Y30/00, B33Y70/00, B33Y80/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | POLYAMIDMATERIAL FÜR 3D-DRUCKER | [2021/09] | English: | POLYAMIDE MATERIAL FOR 3D PRINTERS | [2021/09] | French: | MATÉRIAU POLYAMIDE POUR IMPRIMANTES 3D | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2019 | Translation filed | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 30.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011220667 (PFLEGHAR MARK [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * comparative example 17; page 8; table 6 * [A] 3,8-14; | [X]US2014141168 (RODGERS LUKE M B [US]) [X] 1-14 * page 14; example 3; table 1 ** paragraph [0080] *; | [XA]CN105504801 (CGN-DELTA (JIANGSU) PLASTIC & CHEMCIAL CO LTD) [X] 1-7,9,12 * page 9; example 9; table 2 * [A] 8,10,11,13,14; | [XA]WO2018019728 (BASF SE [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,12 * page 27; example B10; table 3 * [A] 8,10,11,13,14; | [XA]WO2018019727 (BASF SE [DE]) [X] 1-7,9,12 * page 33; example B44; tables 16, 17 * [A] 8,10,11,13,14; | [E]EP3529018 (DU PONT [US]) [E] 1,2,4-14 * page 10; example E10; table 3 * | International search | [X]JP2016505409 (STRATASYS, INC.) [X] 1-12 * , claims, paragraphs [0010], [0045]-[0085], [0125]-[0134], fig. 1, 4, 7-11 & US 2014/0141166 Al, claims, paragraphs [0011], [0066]-[0098], [0137]-[0146], fig. 1, 4, 7-11 *; | [X]JP2017502852 (STRATASYS, INC.) [X] 1-12 * , claims, paragraphs [0011], [0049]-[0087], [0114]-[0117], fig. 1, 4 & WO 2015/081009 A1, claims, paragraphs [0011], [0056]-[0094], [0119]-[0122], fig. 1, 4 *; | [A]WO2017153586 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [A] 1-12 * , entire text & US 2019/0062577 A1, entire text *; | [A]JP6265314B (UBE INDUSTRIES, LTD.) [A] 1-12* , entire text & EP 3479998 A1, entire text * | by applicant | JP2003502184 | JP2003534159 | JP2008194968 | JP2010521339 | WO2015037574 | JP6265314B | JP2018085201 |