EP3784732 - ADDITION OF BIODEGRADABILITY LENDING ADDITIVES TO PLASTIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biologiq, Inc. 3834 Professional Way Idaho Falls, ID 83402 / US | [2021/20] |
Former [2021/09] | For all designated states Biologiq, Inc. 3834 Professional Way Idaho Falls ID 83402 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAPRAY, Bradford 2400 East 25th Street Idaho Falls, Idaho 83404 / US | 02 /
ALLEN, Donald R. 2400 East 25th Street Idaho Falls, Idaho 83404 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19793589.3 | 23.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US28733 | Priority number, date | US201862661387P | 23.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862661387 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209834 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784732 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/06, C08L83/04 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP);
C08K3/012 (KR);
C08K3/10 (KR);
C08K5/0033 (KR);
C08K5/1545 (KR);
C08K5/16 (KR);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08L23/06 (EP);
C09D183/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/06, C08L5/00 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L51/06, C08K3/012 (EP);
C08L23/06, C08L51/06, C08L3/02, C08K3/012 (EP);
C08L83/04, C08L75/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | ZUSATZ VON BIOLOGISCHE ABBAUBARKEIT VERLEIHENDEN ADDITIVEN ZU KUNSTSTOFFEN | [2021/09] | English: | ADDITION OF BIODEGRADABILITY LENDING ADDITIVES TO PLASTIC MATERIALS | [2021/09] | French: | AJOUT D'ADDITIFS CONFÉRANT UNE BIODÉGRADABILITÉ À DES MATIÈRES PLASTIQUES | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 21.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2010115836 (JULIAN BRANDON J [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0024]; claims 1,6-8,10,11 *; | [X]WO2016198652 (CARBIOS [FR]) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,7,10 *; | [A]US2017362418 (LAPRAY BRADFORD [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XP]WO2019043134 (CARBIOLICE [FR]) [XP] 1-15 * example -; claims 1,3,4 * | International search | [A]US2008103232 (LAKE JOHN ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1-20* Entire Document. *; | [A]WO2012088585 (ENERPLASTICS LLC [AE], et al) [A] 3-5, 17-18 * Abstract, para [0005]. *; | [XY]US2017218184 (LAPRAY BRADFORD [US], et al) [X] 1-5, 13, 15-18 * Abstract, para [0003], [0062], [0083]-[0084], [0096],[0116]-[0117], [0126], [0144]-[0145], [0150], and Figure 1. * [Y] 6-12, 14, 19-20; | [A]US2017283597 (LAPRAY BRADFORD [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * Entire Document. *; | [Y] - SUMATHI et al., "Production of laccase by Cochliobolus sp. isolated from plastic dumped soils and their ability to degrade low molecular weight PVC", Biochemistry research international 2016, (20160101), vol. 2018, doi::10.1155/2016/9519527, ISSN 2090-2247, pages 1 - 10, XP055648102 [Y] 6-12, 14, 19-20 * . Abstract, pg 1 col 2 para 2; pg 2 col 1 para 1; pg 2 col 2 para 3; pg 5 col 2 para 3; Table 10. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2016/9519527 | [A] - SHANG et al., "Photocatalytic degradation of polystyrene plastic under fluorescent light", Environmental science & technology, (20031001), vol. 37., no. 19, doi:10.1021/es0209464, ISSN 0013-936X, pages 4494 - 4499, XP055080969 [A] 13 * . Abstract. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/es0209464 | [A] - AHMED et al., "Biodegradation of plastics: current scenario and future prospects for environmental safety", Environmental Science and Pollution Research, (20180113), vol. 25, no. 8, doi:10.1007/s11356-018-1234-9, ISSN 0944-1344, pages 7287 - 7298, XP036455246 [A] 12, 14, 20 * . pg 7 col 1 para 2 - col 2 para 2; Table 1; and Figure 1. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11356-018-1234-9 |