EP3797114 - HUMAN-DERIVED ANTI-(POLY-GA) DIPEPTIDE REPEAT (DPR) ANTIBODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | For all designated states Neurimmune AG Wagistrasse 18 8952 Schlieren / CH | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMM, Jan Neurimmune AG Wagistrasse 13 8952 Schlieren / CH | 02 /
MONTRASIO, Fabio Neurimmune AG Wagistrasse 13 8952 Schlieren / CH | 03 /
DALKILIC-LIDDLE, Isin Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 04 /
RUSHE, Mia Marie Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | 05 /
ARNDT, Joseph Walter Biogen MA Inc. 225 Binney Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02142 / US | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19793769.1 | 25.04.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019US29109 | Priority number, date | EP20180169888 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: EP 18169888 | US201862772809P | 29.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862772809 P | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019210054 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797114 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/44, C07K16/18, A61K39/395, A61P25/28 | [2022/19] | CPC: |
C07K16/44 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/6835 (US);
A61K49/0002 (US);
A61K51/10 (US);
A61P21/00 (KR);
A61P25/28 (EP);
G01N33/6893 (KR);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/24 (KR,US);
C07K2317/33 (EP);
C07K2317/55 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/56 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | C07K5/06, C07K16/44 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Extension states | BA | 27.11.2020 | ME | 27.11.2020 | Validation states | KH | 27.11.2020 | MA | 27.11.2020 | MD | 27.11.2020 | TN | 27.11.2020 | Title | German: | VOM MENSCHEN STAMMENDE ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN (POLY-GA)DIPEPTID-REPEAT (DPR) | [2021/13] | English: | HUMAN-DERIVED ANTI-(POLY-GA) DIPEPTIDE REPEAT (DPR) ANTIBODY | [2021/13] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI-(POLY-GA) DIRIGÉ CONTRE DES RÉPÉTITIONS DIPEPTIDIQUES (DPR) D'ORIGINE HUMAINE | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 30.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 09.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.02.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.02.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 09.02.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.02.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014114303 (DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FÜR NEURODEGENERATIVE ERKRANKUNGEN [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract, examples *; | [IY]WO2016050822 (NEURIMMUNE HOLDING AG [CH]) [I] 1,2,5-15 * whole application, in particular pages 13-15, 50-52, examples, figures, claims * [Y] 3,4; | [Y] - ALAIN BECK ET AL, "Strategies and challenges for the next generation of therapeutic antibodies", NATURE REVIEWS IMMUNOLOGY, (20100501), vol. 10, no. 5, doi:10.1038/nri2747, ISSN 1474-1733, pages 345 - 352, XP055012390 [Y] 3,4 * abstract, p. 347, figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nri2747 | [Y] - DAVID MA MANN ET AL, "Dipeptide repeat proteins are present in the p62 positive inclusions in patients with frontotemporal lobar degeneration and motor neurone disease associated with expansions in C9ORF72", ACTA NEUROPATHOLOGICA COMMUNICATIONS, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON, UK, (20131014), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1186/2051-5960-1-68, ISSN 2051-5960, page 68, XP021165579 [Y] 1-15 * abstract, tables 1, 2 figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/2051-5960-1-68 | [A] - BRIAN D. FREIBAUM ET AL, "The Role of Dipeptide Repeats in C9ORF72-Related ALS-FTD", FRONTIERS IN MOLECULAR NEUROSCIENCE, (20170213), vol. 10, doi:10.3389/fnmol.2017.00035, XP055497300 [A] 1-15 * abstract, pages 3-4 figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/fnmol.2017.00035 | International search | [A]WO2014114303 (DEUTSCHES ZENTRUM FÜR NEURODEGENERATIVE ERKRANKUNGEN [DE]) [A] 1-3, 5-9 * entire document *; | [A]US2017059586 (PETRUCELLI LEONARD [US], et al) [A] 1-3, 5-9 * entire document *; | [A]WO2017136313 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [A] 1-3, 5-9 * entire document *; | [X]US2017247471 (MONTRASIO FABIO [CH], et al) [X] 1-3 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018018031 (UNIV NEW YORK [US]) [A] 1-3, 5-9 * entire document *; | [A] - ZHOU et al., "Antibodies inhibit transmission and aggregation of C9orf72 poly-GA dipeptide repeat proteins", EMBO Molecular Medicine, (20170328), vol. 9, no. 5, doi:10.15252/emmm.201607054, pages 687 - 702, XP055512670 [A] 1-3, 5-9 * . entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15252/emmm.201607054 |