EP3867733 - INPUT APPARATUS, INPUT METHOD, PROGRAM, AND INPUT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | 15.08.2024 | Change - classification | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome, 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASATANI, Kiyoshi c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19794272.5 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019JP40250 | Priority number, date | JP20180194685 | 15.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018194685 | JP20190185271 | 08.10.2019 Original published format: JP 2019185271 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020080300 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867733 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/04883, G06F3/01, G06F3/0354, G06F3/0488, G06F21/31, G06V30/32, G06V30/28, G06V30/244, G06V30/14 | [2024/38] | CPC: |
G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F21/31 (EP,US);
G06F3/018 (EP);
G06F3/03545 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G06V30/1448 (EP,US);
G06V30/1456 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/34] | G06F3/01, G06F3/0354, G06F3/048, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0488, G06K9/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | EINGABEGERÄT, EINGABEVERFAHREN, PROGRAMM UND EINGABESYSTEM | [2021/34] | English: | INPUT APPARATUS, INPUT METHOD, PROGRAM, AND INPUT SYSTEM | [2021/34] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRÉE, PROCÉDÉ D'ENTRÉE, PROGRAMME ET SYSTÈME D'ENTRÉE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 01.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014062962 (JANG SIHAK [KR], et al); | [XI]US2015046433 (LEE MYOUNG-JUN [KR], et al) | by applicant | JP2018026185 | JP2018194685 | JP2019185271 |