EP3857591 - PRECLEAN AND DIELECTRIC DEPOSITION METHODOLOGY FOR SUPERCONDUCTOR INTERCONNECT FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN SYSTEMS CORPORATION 2980 Fairview Park Drive Falls Church, VA 22042-4511 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAGNER, Brian, Paul 24 N. Kenwood Avenue Baltimore, MD 21224 / US | 02 /
KIRBY, Christopher, F. 204 Mustang Ct. Gambrills, MD 21054 / US | 03 /
RENNIE, Michael 9364 Wild Honeysuckle Lane Ashland, VA 23005 / US | 04 /
KELLIHER, James, T. 6030 Marshalee Drive PMB609 Elkridge, MD 21075-5987 / US | 05 /
LIM, Khyhouth 218 N Charles Street Apt. 1510 Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | Iqbal, Md Mash-Hud Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19794298.0 | 03.10.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US54551 | Priority number, date | US201816178306 | 01.11.2018 Original published format: US201816178306 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020091943 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3857591 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/02, H01L21/768, H01L39/24 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
H01L21/02074 (EP,KR);
H01L21/76891 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02063 (US);
H01L21/02068 (US);
H01L21/76826 (US);
H01L21/76883 (EP,KR);
H01L23/53285 (US);
H01L23/53295 (US);
H10N60/0156 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/02697 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VORREINIGUNG UND DIELEKTRISCHEN ABSCHEIDUNG FÜR DIE HERSTELLUNG EINER SUPRALEITERVERBINDUNG | [2021/31] | English: | PRECLEAN AND DIELECTRIC DEPOSITION METHODOLOGY FOR SUPERCONDUCTOR INTERCONNECT FABRICATION | [2021/31] | French: | MÉTHODOLOGIE DE PRÉ-NETTOYAGE ET DE DÉPÔT DIÉLECTRIQUE POUR LA FABRICATION D'INTERCONNEXION DE SUPRACONDUCTEUR | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 27.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2021 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.11.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6365518 (LEE ALBERT [US], et al); | [Y]US2003203614 (RAJAGOPALAN NAGARAJAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2004005775 (CHOU SHIH-WEI [TW], et al); | [Y]US2015179913 (PRAMANIK DIPANKAR [US], et al); | [Y]US2018053689 (KIRBY CHRISTOPHER F [US], et al); | [XYI]US2018151430 (KIRBY CHRISTOPHER F [US], et al) |