EP3880147 - REHABILITATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUKA Deutschland GmbH Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEDEL, Martin Curtiusstraße 23 86165 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
SCHOBER, Wolfgang La Haye-Pesnel Straße 17 86554 Pöttmes / DE | 03 /
SCHELLHASE, Matthias Vogelmauer 31 86152 Augsburg / DE | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Oelke, Jochen KUKA Aktiengesellschaft Zugspitzstraße 140 86165 Augsburg / DE | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19794455.6 | 21.10.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP78486 | Priority number, date | DE201810219446 | 14.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018219446 | [2021/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020099066 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880147 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/02 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
A61H1/00 (EP);
A61H1/02 (EP);
A61H1/0274 (EP);
A61H2201/018 (EP);
A61H2201/0192 (EP);
A61H2201/1207 (EP);
A61H2201/1638 (EP);
A61H2201/1642 (EP);
A61H2201/1659 (EP);
A61H2201/5053 (EP);
A61H2201/5061 (EP);
A61H2205/06 (EP);
A61H2205/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | REHABILITATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/38] | English: | REHABILITATION DEVICE | [2021/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE RÉÉDUCATION | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 14.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2012179075 (PERRY JOEL [US], et al) [Y] 1,4-11,17 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0114] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0111] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0126] * [A] 2,3,12-16,18; | [A]US2015167798 (GOSSELIN FLORIAN [FR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106078710 (INVENTEC APPLIANCES SHANGHAI CO LTD , et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [YA]WO2017216075 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,4-11,13 * page 2, line 1 - page 2, line 28; figures 1-14 * * page 24, line 14 - line 25 * * page 23, line 3 - line 28 * [A] 2,3,12,14-18; | [XY]WO2018086748 (KUKA ROBOTER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,12,16 * figures 1-14; claims 1-23 * [Y] 4-11,13,17 | by applicant | WO2015048688 |