EP3870067 - INTRALUMINAL ULTRASOUND IMAGING WITH AUTOMATIC AND ASSISTED LABELS AND BOOKMARKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | For all designated states Philips Image Guided Therapy Corporation 3721 Valley Centre Drive, Suite 500 San Diego CA 92130 / US | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENKINS, Rebecca, Ann High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
CHAO, Pei-Yin High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
RAJGURU, Nikhil, Sreedhar High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 04 /
LEFEVER, Tracy High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 05 /
ROWE, Carl High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2023/25] |
Former [2021/35] | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 19794512.4 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP78963 | Priority number, date | US201862751268P | 26.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862751268 P | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084028 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870067 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3870067 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12, A61B8/00, G16H15/00, G16H10/60 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A61B8/465 (EP);
A61B8/12 (EP,US);
A61B8/4245 (EP);
A61B8/461 (EP);
A61B8/463 (US);
A61B8/468 (EP,US);
A61B8/5207 (US);
A61B8/5292 (US);
G06F3/0486 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
G06F3/167 (US);
G16H30/40 (EP);
G16H20/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INTRALUMINALE ULTRASCHALLBILDGEBUNG MIT AUTOMATISCHEN UND UNTERSTÜTZTEN ETIKETTEN UND LESEZEICHEN | [2021/35] | English: | INTRALUMINAL ULTRASOUND IMAGING WITH AUTOMATIC AND ASSISTED LABELS AND BOOKMARKS | [2021/35] | French: | IMAGERIE ULTRASONORE INTRALUMINALE AVEC MARQUEURS ET ÉTIQUETTES AUTOMATIQUES ET ASSISTÉS | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 26.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23175611.5 / EP4226864 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | MC | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | LU | 24.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | FR | 31.10.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
LU | 24.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
FR | 31.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/30] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
LU | 24.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
MC | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
IT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SI | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007268280 (FUJITA MANABU [JP], et al); | [Y]US2014282142 (LIN SHENGTZ [US]); | [XYI]US2015230775 (KOBAYASHI YOUHEI [JP]); | [X]CA2986226 (LIGHTLAB IMAGING INC [US]); | [XYI]WO2017066108 (LIGHTLAB IMAGING INC [US]); | [XY]CN107019513 (UNIV SHANDONG QILU HOSPITAL, et al) | by applicant | US6200268 | US6381350 | US7074188 | US7175597 | US7215802 | US7359554 | US7463759 | US7846101 |