EP3864775 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HIGH-ALTITUDE RADIO/OPTICAL HYBRID PLATFORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Network Systems, LLC 11717 Exploration Lane Germantown, MD 20876 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAY, Stanley, Edward 3805 Fox Valley Drive Rockville, MD 20853 / US | 02 /
BECKER, Neal, David 18416 Oxfordshire Terrace Olney, MD 20832 / US | 03 /
LEE, Lin-Nan 10004 Flower Gate Terrace Potomac, MD 20854 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Reeve, Nicholas Edward Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 19795430.8 | 15.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US56320 | Priority number, date | US201862745254P | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745254 P | US201816237358 | 31.12.2018 Original published format: US201816237358 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077362 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864775 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/118, H04B7/185 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
H04B10/118 (EP,US);
H04B10/29 (US);
H04B10/503 (US);
H04B7/18504 (EP,US);
H04B7/18513 (EP,US);
H04B7/18517 (EP);
H04B7/18541 (EP);
H04B7/1858 (EP,US);
H04B7/19 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN FÜR FUNK-/OPTISCHE HYBRIDPLATTFORM IN GROSSER HÖHENLAGE | [2021/33] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR HIGH-ALTITUDE RADIO/OPTICAL HYBRID PLATFORM | [2021/33] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PLATEFORME HYBRIDE RADIO/OPTIQUE HAUTE ALTITUDE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 30.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005249501 (WOLCOTT THEODORE J [US], et al); | [A]US2014341586 (WYLER GREGORY THANE [US]); | [I]EP3200358 (BOEING CO [US]); | [A]US2018019816 (WANG LEAH [US], et al); | [A]CN104639642B ; | by applicant | US6327063 | US2003213872 | US2013177321 | US2013177322 | US2013179008 | US2014085135 | US2015063159 | US2015244458 | US2015270890 | US2015271730 | US2015318916 | US2016037434 | US2016105806 | US2016204865 | US2016211908 | US2017085411 | US9723386 | US2017272131 | US2017294957 | US2018074208 | US2018084476 | US2018098247 | US2018160373 | US2018191431 | US2018192298 | US2018234284 |