EP3866584 - TOMATO PLANT PRODUCING FRUITS WITH MODIFIED SUGAR CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | For all designated states The State of Israel, Ministry of Agriculture and Rural Development, Agricultural Research Organization (ARO) (Volcani Center) Volcani Center P.O. Box 15159 7528809 Rishon Lezion / IL | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAFFER, Arthur Agricultural Research Organization Department of Vegetable Research, Volcani Center 7528809 Rishon Lezion / IL | 02 /
RICKETT, Daniel Syngenta Limited Syngenta, Jealott s Hill Int. Research Centre Bracknell Berkshire RG42 6EY / GB | 03 /
BONNET, Julien Syngenta France SAS 12, chemin de l'Hobit, BP 2 31790 Saint-Sauveur / FR | 04 /
MOY, Michal Agricultural Research Organization Department of Vegetable Research, Volcani Center 7528809 Rishon Lezion / IL | 05 /
BAXTER, Charles Syngenta Crop Protection, LLC 9 Davis Drive Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US | 06 /
HOUMINER, Naomi P.O. box 94 9984500 Luzit / IL | 07 /
PETREIKOV, Marina Agricultural Research Organization Department of Vegetable Research, Volcani Center 7528809 Rishon Lezion / IL | 08 /
YESELSON, Yelena Agricultural Research Organization Department of Vegetable Research, Volcani Center 7528809 Rishon Lezion / IL | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | SYNGENTA IP Rosentalstrasse 67 4058 Basel / CH | [2021/34] | Application number, filing date | 19795462.1 | 11.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP77627 | Priority number, date | EP20180200806 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18200806 | EP20180207600 | 21.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18207600 | EP20190152831 | 21.01.2019 Original published format: EP 19152831 | [2021/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078852 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3866584 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01H5/08, C12Q1/6895, C12N9/24, A01H6/82 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
A01H6/825 (EP,KR,US);
A01H1/00 (US);
A01H1/102 (US);
A01H5/08 (EP,KR,US);
C12N9/16 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/6895 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Title | German: | TOMATENPFLANZE, DIE FRÜCHTE MIT EINEM MODIFIZIERTEN ZUCKERGEHALT HERVORBRINGT | [2021/34] | English: | TOMATO PLANT PRODUCING FRUITS WITH MODIFIED SUGAR CONTENT | [2021/34] | French: | PLANT DE TOMATE PRODUISANT DES FRUITS AYANT UNE TENEUR EN SUCRE MODIFIÉE | [2021/34] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 17.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012095841 (ISRAEL STATE [IL], et al); | [Y]AU2013200775 (SIMPLOT CO J R); |