EP3861051 - NOVEL COUPLED ESTERS OF POLYLACTIC ACID AND COUPLED ESTERS OF POLYGLYCOLIC ACID AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fashion Chemicals, GmbH & Co. KG Isardamm 79-83 82538 Geretsried / DE | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCOY, Kay M. 103 Melrose Ct. For Mill, SC 29715 / US | 02 /
MEREDITH, Paul C. 15320 Elham Ln. Huntersville, NC 28078 / US | 03 /
SIMS, Philip F. 6907 Legacy Lane Waxhaw, NC 28173 / US | 04 /
LANGLEY, Jeffrey T. 4934 Willow Pond Rd. Gastonia, NC 28506 / US | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19795702.0 | 03.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019US54495 | Priority number, date | US201862740944P | 03.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862740944 P | US201962828961P | 03.04.2019 Original published format: US 201962828961 P | [2021/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020072772 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861051 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/664, C08G65/332, D06M15/507, D06M15/53 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
C08G63/664 (EP,IL,KR);
D06M15/53 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C08G65/3322 (EP,IL,KR);
C08L67/04 (IL,KR,US);
C08L71/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D06M15/256 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D06M15/507 (EP,IL,KR);
C08L2201/06 (KR,US);
D06M2101/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D06M2101/20 (EP,IL,KR);
D06M2101/32 (EP,IL,KR,US);
D06M2101/34 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L71/02, C08L67/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE GEKOPPELTE ESTER VON POLYMILCHSÄURE UND GEKOPPELTE ESTER VON POLYGLYKOLSÄURE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAVON | [2021/32] | English: | NOVEL COUPLED ESTERS OF POLYLACTIC ACID AND COUPLED ESTERS OF POLYGLYCOLIC ACID AND COMPOSITIONS THEREOF | [2021/32] | French: | NOUVEAUX ESTERS D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE COUPLÉS ET ESTERS D'ACIDE POLYLACTIQUE COUPLÉS ET COMPOSITIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 26.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2917410 (VITALIS EMIL A) [A] 1-66 * claims 1-21 * * examples 1-36 *; | [XI]US6007845 (DOMB ABRAHAM J [IL], et al) [X] 1-5,12-14,21,22,32,36,38 * Examples * [I] 6-11,15-20,23-31,33-35,37,39; | [XI]EP1297938 (GOLDSCHMIDT AG TH [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-11,15,16,20,36-38,40,57 * claim 1 * * example 1 * [I] 6,12-14,17-19,21-35,39,41-56,58-66; | [X]WO03028589 (MACROMED INC [US], et al) [X] 1,6,9,10,32-35,38 * example 11 *; | [A]US6579837 (FLEURY ETIENNE [FR], et al) [A] 1-66 * claims 1-17 ** examples 1-5 *; | [XI]US2006034888 (PACETTI STEPHEN D [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9-11,15-17,32,33,38,39 * Examples * [I] 6-8,12-14,18-31,34-37 |