EP3787802 - MINI POCKET HOLE JIG SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kreg Enterprises Inc. 201 Campus Drive Huxley, Iowa 50124 / US | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHAAF, Scott 1914 NE Northbrook Drive Ankeny, IA 50021 / US | 02 /
FORBES, Timothy, J. 1309 NW Beechwood Street Ankeny, IA 50023 / US | 03 /
HOLLAND, Neil, M. 504 Boone Street Slater, IA 50244 / US | 04 /
HILL, Brian 3807 Columbine Avenue Ames, IA 50010 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19795766.5 | 29.04.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019US29617 | Priority number, date | US201862664335P | 30.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862664335 P | US201862785967P | 28.12.2018 Original published format: US 201862785967 P | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212957 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787802 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23B47/28 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
B23B47/287 (EP,US);
B23B49/005 (US);
B23B51/009 (US);
B23B2247/10 (EP,US);
B23B2260/088 (EP,US);
Y10T408/567 (US);
Y10T408/8925 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | B05C17/02, B41K1/22, B41K1/42, B44D3/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | MINI-SACKLOCHBOHRSCHABLONENSYSTEM | [2021/10] | English: | MINI POCKET HOLE JIG SYSTEM | [2021/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GABARIT À MINI-TROUS BORGNES | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 21.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4421442 (LINDBLAD CYRIL M [US]); | [A]US2007041800 (SANTOS JAY P [CA]); | [XAI]US2007201961 (CHIANG VANCE [TW]) | International search | [A]US2004253065 (DAVIS ROBERT L [US]); | [XY]US2007201961 (CHIANG VANCE [TW]); | [A]US2007280797 (MCDANIEL STEVEN D [US], et al); | [A]US2011150587 (STUKULS ALFRED [US]); | [Y]US8840345 (PARK JOON [US]); | [XP]US2018214960 (EVATT THOMAS [US], et al) | by applicant | US2007201961 | US7798750 | US8231313 | US20070894253 | US20070947722 |