EP3880758 - METHOD OF TREATMENT OF A SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For:CY
CZ
DE
GB
IE
IT
MT
RS
TR
UNILEVER GLOBAL IP LIMITED Port Sunlight Wirral Merseyside CH62 4ZD / GB | For:AL
AT
BE
BG
CH
CZ
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HR
HU
IS
LI
LT
LU
LV
MC
MK
NL
NO
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
SM
Unilever IP Holdings B.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTSAKIS, Panagiotis Leoforos Aiolidos 3 Dionysos 145 76 Athens / GR | 02 /
PARRY, Neil James Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | 03 /
RAMAGE, Gordon University of Glasgow University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | 04 /
YOUNG, Tracy Lynn University of Glasgow University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/38] | 01 /
KOTSAKIS, Panagiotis Leoforos Aiolidos 3 Dionysos 145 76 Athens / GR | ||
02 /
PARRY, Neil, James Unilever R&D Port Sunlight Quarry Road East Bebington Wirral Merseyside CH63 3JW / GB | |||
03 /
RAMAGE, Gordon University of Glasgow University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | |||
04 /
YOUNG, Tracy, Lynn University of Glasgow University Avenue Glasgow G12 8QQ / GB | Representative(s) | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/38] | McHugh, Paul Edward Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Bronland 14 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 19797731.7 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP80236 | Priority number, date | EP20180205274 | 08.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18205274 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020094641 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880758 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3880758 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/16, C09D7/63, C09D5/14 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
C09D5/1625 (EP,US);
C08K5/0058 (US);
C08K5/3415 (EP,US);
C09D5/14 (EP,US);
C09D7/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG EINER OBERFLÄCHE | [2021/38] | English: | METHOD OF TREATMENT OF A SURFACE | [2021/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/38] | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT D'UNE SURFACE | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 19.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003162924 (VOS MARCEL [BE], et al); | [Y]WO2007030389 (NOVUS INT INC [US], et al); | [XY]WO2017029118 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [XY]WO2017029093 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al); | [X]CN108658973 (OCEAN UNIV CHINA) | Examination | WO2018091222 |