EP3853067 - SPRING LOADED RETRACTABLE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES, HR, PL, RS | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jeiko Innovations Oy Ranssunkaari 8 B 31 05800 Hyvinkää / FI | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HICKS, Richard 26 Latchmere Lane Kingston Upon Thames, Surrey KT2 5PD / GB | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19797768.9 | 20.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019FI50681 | Priority number, date | FI20180005793 | 21.09.2018 Original published format: FI 20185793 | FI20180006058 | 07.12.2018 Original published format: FI 20186058 | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058581 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853067 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3853067 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60P7/08, A01K27/00 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
B60P7/0846 (EP,US);
B65H75/48 (US);
A01K27/004 (EP);
B65H75/4439 (US);
B65H2407/10 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | 22.03.2021 | Title | German: | GEFEDERTE EINZIEHBARE VORRICHTUNG | [2021/30] | English: | SPRING LOADED RETRACTABLE DEVICE | [2021/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF RÉTRACTABLE À RESSORT | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 22.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/20] | GR | 19.01.2024 | |
IS | 18.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US7621856 (KEITH GARY S [US], et al) [X] 30 * abstract * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 51 * * column 5, lines 38-61 * * figures 1, 5 * [A] 1-29,31; | [XAI]DE102012105250 (ZHENG MEI-YU [TW]) [X] 1-3,10-12,17-20,25-29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] * * figures 1-6 * [A] 6,7,21,24,30,31 [I] 4,5,8,9,13-16,22,23; | [XA]US2016278345 (HOLMSTROM ERIC JAMES [US]) [X] 19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0044] - [0 72] * * figures 1-6, 18 * [A] 1-18,20-31; | [A]US9770012 (CHAPPELL MORGAN L [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 3 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 30 ** figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US7503736 | WO2015036724 |