EP3680893 - SOUND ABSORBING/INSULATING HONEYCOMB PANEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shizuka Co., Ltd. 492-1, Kaneda Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0807 / JP | [2023/23] |
Former [2020/29] | For all designated states Shizuka Co., Ltd. 492-1, Kaneda Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430807 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKE, Koichi 23-9, Nagahama 1-Chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2360011 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Tomohisa c/o SHIZUKA CO., LTD. 492-1, Kaneda Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430807 / JP | 03 /
IWASAKI, Daitsuke c/o SHIZUKA CO., LTD. 492-1, Kaneda Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430807 / JP | 04 /
NEMOTO, Takuma c/o SHIZUKA CO., LTD. 492-1, Kaneda Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 2430807 / JP | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [2020/29] | Application number, filing date | 19797975.0 | 26.06.2019 | [2020/29] | WO2019JP25329 | Priority number, date | JP20180210130 | 08.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018210130 | JP20190070929 | 02.04.2019 Original published format: JP 2019070929 | [2020/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020095475 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | JA | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3680893 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3680893 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.05.2020 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B32B37/12, G10K11/172, E04B1/82, B32B37/14, B32B5/24, B31F5/04, G10K11/168, E04C2/36, E04B1/86, B32B15/20, B32B15/02, B32B5/18, B32B3/12, G10K11/16, B31D3/02, B32B5/02, B32B7/12, E04B1/74 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
G10K11/172 (EP);
B32B37/146 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/1292 (US);
B31D3/0284 (EP);
B31D3/0292 (EP);
B32B3/12 (EP,KR,US);
B32B37/12 (EP);
B32B37/1284 (EP,KR);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/24 (KR);
B32B5/245 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP);
B32B7/14 (US);
E04B1/86 (EP,US);
E04C2/36 (EP);
E04C2/365 (US);
G10K11/168 (EP,US);
B32B2262/103 (EP,US);
B32B2266/0278 (US);
B32B2266/0285 (US);
B32B2305/024 (KR);
B32B2307/102 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/724 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | B32B37/12, G10K11/16, B32B3/12, B32B5/18, B32B15/02, B32B15/20, E04B1/86, E04C2/36, G10K11/168, B31F5/04, B32B5/24, B32B37/14, E04B1/82, G10K11/172 | ||
Former IPC [2020/29] | G10K11/16, B32B3/12, B32B5/18, B32B15/02, B32B15/20, E04B1/86, E04C2/36, G10K11/168 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALLDÄMPFENDE/-DÄMMENDE WABENPLATTE | [2023/11] | English: | SOUND ABSORBING/INSULATING HONEYCOMB PANEL | [2020/29] | French: | PANNEAU EN NID D'ABEILLES INSONORISANT/ISOLANT | [2020/29] |
Former [2020/29] | SCHALLDÄMPFENDE/IDÄMMENDE WABENPLATTE | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2019 | Translation filed | 13.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 21.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.06.2023 | CZ | 07.06.2023 | DK | 07.06.2023 | EE | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | FI | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | IT | 07.06.2023 | LT | 07.06.2023 | LV | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | NL | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SE | 07.06.2023 | SI | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 26.06.2023 | LU | 26.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | PT | 09.10.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SI | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 26.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
DK | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 26.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
IE | 26.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
LU | 26.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
EE | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
PT | 09.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 07.06.2023 | |
CZ | 07.06.2023 | ||
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
FI | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
LT | 07.06.2023 | ||
LV | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
NL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
SE | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5289481U (SHIN NIPPON KOA KK) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB2277709 (HONICEL NEDERLAND [NL]) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1,5 * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]JP2007062181 (SHIZUKA KK) [X] 1-5 * figures 1-4 * * claims 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0013] , [0016] , [0020] *; | [Y]EP1829674 (SHIZUKA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1-7 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]JP5127975B (SHIZUKA CO., LTD.) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [A]JP2015199320 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2018103607 (SHIZUKA CO LTD) [Y] 1-5 * claims 1-22 * * figures 1-6 * | International search | [A]JPS5289481U (SHIN NIPPON KOA KK) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2007062181 (SHIZUKA KK) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0019]-[0023], fig. 1, 2 & US 2008/0260992 A1, paragraphs [0064]-[0072], fig. 7, 8 & US 2011/0079338 A1 & US 2012/0021169 A1 & WO 2006/132184 A1 & EP 1829674 A1 & CN 101142078 A & KR 10-2008-0012827 A & KR 10-0932381 B1 *; | [A]JP5127975B (SHIZUKA CO., LTD.) [A] 1-5* , entire text, all drawings & US 2015/0284947 A1, entire text, all drawings & WO 2013/069202 A1 & EP 2779158 A1 & CN 103733251 A *; | [A]JP2015199320 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-5 * , paragraphs [0029]-[0035], fig. 6-10 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPS50178337 | JPS5127975B | JPS5289481U | JPS6331619B | JP3806744B | JP6292339B |