EP3873266 - SMOKING SUBSTITUTE CONSUMABLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Imperial Tobacco Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol, BS3 2LL / GB | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORD, Chris C/o NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | 02 /
FERRIE, Kate C/o NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | 03 /
SHENTON, Edward Ross C/o NERUDIA LIMITED Wellington House Physics Road Speke Liverpool Merseyside L24 9HP / GB | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19798012.1 | 25.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019EP79284 | Priority number, date | GB20180017573 | 29.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201817573 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020089123 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873266 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3873266 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A24D1/20, A24D3/04 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A24D1/20 (EP);
A24D3/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUCHERSATZVERBRAUCHSSTOFF | [2021/36] | English: | SMOKING SUBSTITUTE CONSUMABLE | [2021/36] | French: | CONSOMMABLE DE SUBSTITUTION À L'ACTE DE FUMER | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 27.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 24.04.2024 | [2024/44] | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US5265626 (SCHNEIDER WERNER [DE], et al); | [Y]DE202013009444U (BRITISH AMERICAN TOBACCO CO [GB]); | [XAY]WO2014049494 (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]); | [XY]CN103271437B (CHINA TOBACCO GUANGDONG IND CO); | [Y]US2014305448 (ZUBER GERARD [CH], et al); | [XY]US2018000152 (ITO KENJI [JP], et al) |