EP4051893 - THROTTLE VALVE DEVICE FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM OR A SUPPLY AIR SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Strasse 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAUTEN, Andreas c/o Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Straße 1 41460 Neuss / DE | 02 /
KAMARYS, Dirk c/o Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Straße 1 41460 Neuss / DE | 03 /
MICHELS, Jürgen c/o Pierburg GmbH Alfred-Pierburg-Straße 1 41460 Neuss / DE | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | terpatent PartGmbB Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/36] | terpatent Patentanwälte ter Smitten Eberlein-Van Hoof Rütten Daubert Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Burgunderstraße 29 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19798047.7 | 31.10.2019 | [2022/36] | WO2019EP79852 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021083525 | Date: | 06.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4051893 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02D9/10, F02D9/04 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
F02D9/1035 (EP);
F02D9/106 (EP);
F16K1/2268 (EP);
F16K27/0218 (EP);
F02D9/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/36] | Title | German: | DROSSELKLAPPENVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN ABGASSTRANG ODER EINEN ZULUFTSTRANG EINES VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2022/36] | English: | THROTTLE VALVE DEVICE FOR AN EXHAUST SYSTEM OR A SUPPLY AIR SYSTEM OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2022/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUPAPE D'ÉTRANGLEMENT POUR UN SYSTÈME D'ÉCHAPPEMENT OU UN SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION EN AIR D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2022/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.05.2022 | Examination requested [2022/36] | 25.05.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004187844 (TORII KATSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** paragraphs [0004] , [0044] *; | [A]WO2008144686 (BORGWARNER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0032] - [0034] - [0045] - [0053] *; | [XAI]US2015226161 (BAREIS BERND [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0046] * [A] 6,9 [I] 4,5,11-14; | [AD]WO2017216241 (FISCHER ROHRTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-14 * abstract * * page 12, line 21 - page 15, line 13 * | by applicant | WO2017216241 |