EP3867450 - CLEARING STRIP FOR THE CLEARING BLADE OF A SNOWPLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Küper GmbH & Co. KG Mettestr. 23 44803 Bochum / DE | [2021/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜPER, Roland Castroper Str. 102 44791 Bochum / DE | 02 /
THOMAS, Jörg Dahlienweg 1a 44869 Bochum / DE | 03 /
REITZ, Oliver Zehntfeld 14 44575 Castrop-Rauxel / DE | [2021/34] | Representative(s) | Schneiders & Behrendt Bochum Gerard-Mortier-Platz 6 44793 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/34] | Schneiders & Behrendt Bochum Huestraße 23 44787 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 19798171.5 | 15.10.2019 | [2021/34] | WO2019EP77932 | Priority number, date | DE201810125674 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018125674 | [2021/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020078988 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3867450 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3867450 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/06 | [2021/34] | CPC: |
E01H5/061 (EP);
E01H5/066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÄUMLEISTE FÜR DEN RÄUMSCHILD EINES SCHNEEPFLUGS | [2021/34] | English: | CLEARING STRIP FOR THE CLEARING BLADE OF A SNOWPLOW | [2021/34] | French: | RACLE DE DÉBLAYAGE POUR LA LAME DE DÉBLAYAGE D'UN CHASSE-NEIGE | [2021/34] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/34] | 17.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.10.2023 | ES | 04.10.2023 | HR | 04.10.2023 | MC | 04.10.2023 | PL | 04.10.2023 | RO | 04.10.2023 | RS | 04.10.2023 | SK | 04.10.2023 | SM | 04.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 04.01.2024 | GR | 05.01.2024 | IS | 04.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SK | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 04.10.2023 | |
ES | 04.10.2023 | ||
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RO | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
CH | 31.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
SM | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 04.10.2023 | |
HR | 04.10.2023 | ||
PL | 04.10.2023 | ||
RS | 04.10.2023 | ||
NO | 04.01.2024 | ||
GR | 05.01.2024 | ||
IS | 04.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 05.01.2024 | |
IS | 04.02.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3518487 (KUEPER GUMMI [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102016119769 (KUEPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-9* figure 3 * | Examination | WO2006052196 |