EP3877841 - SAVING AND RESTORING MACHINE STATE BETWEEN MULTIPLE EXECUTIONS OF AN INSTRUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HR, RS | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, New York 10504 / US | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIAMEI, Bruce, Conrad IBM CORPORATION 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 02 /
RECKTENWALD, Martin IBM DEUTSCHLAND GMBH Schoenaicher Srasse 220 71032 Boeblingen / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Donald, William IBM CORPORATION 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 04 /
SLEGEL, Timothy IBM CORPORATION 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 05 /
PURANIK, Aditya, Nitin IBM INDIA PVT LIMITED INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW Embassy Links, Embassy Cypress PT, Indiranagar- Koramangala Intermediate Ring Road Bangalore Karnataka 560071 / IN | 06 /
FARRELL, Mark IBM CORPORATION 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 07 /
JACOBI, Christian IBM CORPORATION 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 08 /
BRADBURY, Jonathan IBM CORPORATION 2455 South Road Poughkeepsie, New York 12601-5400 / US | 09 /
ZOELLIN, Christian, Gerhard IBM CORPORATION 11400 Burnet Road Austin, Texas 78758-3493 / US | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | IBM United Kingdom Limited, et al Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [2024/08] |
Former [2021/37] | Shaw, Anita, et al IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 19798280.4 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019EP80161 | Priority number, date | US201816182017 | 06.11.2018 Original published format: US201816182017 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020094601 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877841 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3877841 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/30, G06F9/38 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
G06F9/30032 (EP,IL);
G06F9/3861 (EP,IL,US);
G06F9/30021 (EP,IL);
G06F9/30145 (IL,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPEICHERUNG UND WIEDERHERSTELLUNG DES MASCHINENZUSTANDS ZWISCHEN MEHREREN AUSFÜHRUNGEN EINES BEFEHLS | [2021/37] | English: | SAVING AND RESTORING MACHINE STATE BETWEEN MULTIPLE EXECUTIONS OF AN INSTRUCTION | [2021/37] | French: | SAUVEGARDE ET RESTAURATION DE L'ÉTAT MACHINE ENTRE DE MULTIPLES EXÉCUTIONS D'UNE INSTRUCTION | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 03.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2023 | 22.11.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | NO | 21.05.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4779192 (TORII SHUNICHI [JP], et al); | [X]US5475822 (SIBIGTROTH JAMES M [US], et al); | [XI]US2014089646 (DIEWALD HORST [DE], et al) | Examination | EP3877840 |