EP3810517 - HYGIENE SYSTEM FOR A PORTABLE PACKAGED FOOD CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecolab USA Inc. 1 Ecolab Place St. Paul, MN 55012 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ying Floor 1-3 Building C Floor 4-5 Building B No.255 Guiqiao Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
DING, Zhili Floor 1-3 Building C Floor 4-5 Building B No.255 Guiqiao Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
YU, Huarong Floor 1-3 Building C Floor 4-5 Building B No.255 Guiqiao Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | 04 /
WEI, Wenbin Floor 1-3 Building C Floor 4-5 Building B No.255 Guiquao Road Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19798975.9 | 19.02.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019CN75440 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN86468 | 11.05.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/086468 | WO2018CN114274 | 07.11.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/114274 | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019214310 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810517 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/02, A61L9/14 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
A61L2/22 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65D81/28 (KR);
A61L2/16 (US);
A61L2/24 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B08B13/00 (EP,KR,US);
B08B9/00 (EP,US);
B08B9/08 (US);
B08B9/0861 (US);
B08B9/093 (EP,KR,US);
B65B55/02 (CN,US);
B65B55/04 (CN,US);
B65B55/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65D81/24 (CN,US);
G08B21/24 (KR);
G08B5/223 (KR,US);
G08C17/02 (KR);
A61L12/086 (US);
A61L2202/14 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2202/15 (EP,CN,US);
A61L2202/16 (CN,US);
A61L2202/17 (CN,US);
A61L2202/23 (EP,CN,US);
B08B2209/08 (US);
H01L21/67028 (US);
H01L21/6704 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | HYGIENESYSTEM FÜR EINEN TRAGBAREN VERPACKTEN LEBENSMITTELBEHÄLTER | [2021/17] | English: | HYGIENE SYSTEM FOR A PORTABLE PACKAGED FOOD CONTAINER | [2021/17] | French: | SYSTÈME D'HYGIÈNE POUR CONTENANT PORTATIF D'ALIMENTS EMBALLÉS | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 08.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017069199 (MAGNO MARINO [IT], et al); | [Y]CN207258372U (LYU SHUO) | International search | [A]JP2001315721 (TODA CONSTRUCTION, et al); | [A]KR100838949B (GOO JAE HOO [KR]); | [Y]CN104867246 (XIE XIAOFAN); | [Y]CN105242657 (GUILIN TENGRUI ELECTRONIC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN106715274 (PREGIS INNOVATIVE PACKAGING LLC); | [A]CN107845206 (GUANGZHOU GAOZHONG TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | CN104867246 | US2017069199 | CN207258372U |