EP3770463 - VIBRATION DAMPING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prospira Corporation 580, Horikawa-cho Saiwai-ku Kawasaki city Kanagawa prefecture 212-0013 / JP | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/04] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1 Kyobashi 3-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATAKE Yuki c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 02 /
MIKOSHIBA Rei c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 03 /
UEKI Akira c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | 04 /
NAGASHIMA Yasuyuki c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3- chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2021/04] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2024/30] |
Former [2021/04] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19799394.2 | 10.05.2019 | [2021/04] | WO2019JP18695 | Priority number, date | JP20180091483 | 10.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018091483 | [2021/04] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019216403 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3770463 | Date: | 27.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3770463 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16F13/10 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
F16F13/105 (EP);
F16F13/107 (US);
B60K5/1208 (US);
F16F2228/007 (US);
F16F2232/08 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIBRATIONSDÄMPFUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/04] | English: | VIBRATION DAMPING DEVICE | [2021/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT DE VIBRATIONS | [2021/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2020 | Translation filed | 20.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/04] | 23.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2282430 (AVON CLEVITE LTD [GB]); | [A]EP1283377 (HUTCHINSON [FR]); | [A]JP2010031989 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD) | International search | [A]JPH01193426 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD); | [A]JP2010031989 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD); | [A]JP2015059655 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) | by applicant | JP2002327789 | JP2018091483 |