EP3791410 - MAGNET WIRE WITH CORONA RESISTANT POLYIMIDE INSULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Essex Furukawa Magnet Wire USA LLC 1601 Wall Street Fort Wayne, IN 46802 / US | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNERR, Allan, R. 6507 Sedgemore Place Fort Wayne, IN 46845 / US | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19799445.2 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019US30804 | Priority number, date | US201862667649P | 07.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862667649 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019217254 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791410 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01B3/30, H01B3/00, H01B3/18, C08K3/36, // C08K3/22 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H01B3/305 (EP,KR,US);
H01B7/0216 (KR,US);
C08K3/36 (EP);
H01B3/306 (EP,KR,US);
H01B7/2813 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/2241 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/36, C08L79/08 (EP);
C08K2003/2241, C08L79/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/11] | H01B3/30, H01B3/00, H01B3/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | MAGNETDRAHT MIT KORONARESISTENTER POLYIMIDISOLIERUNG | [2021/11] | English: | MAGNET WIRE WITH CORONA RESISTANT POLYIMIDE INSULATION | [2021/11] | French: | FIL D'AIMANT DOTÉ D'ISOLATION EN POLYIMIDE RÉSISTANT À L'EFFET COURONNE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 02.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4430384 (GEORGE STEPHEN [US]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]US6100474 (MCGREGOR CHARLES W [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6337442 (LIENERT KLAUS-WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * examples 1.1.1 - 1.3; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US2012080970 (YIN WEIJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US5861578 (HAKE JOHN E [US], et al) [Y] 8-11, 18-21* entire document *; | [Y]US6337442 (LIENERT KLAUS-WILHELM [DE], et al) [Y] 1-21 * entire document *; | [Y]US2002142161 (GRIMES CYNTHIA [US]) [Y] 1-21 * entire document *; | [Y]WO2017042159 (SOLVAY SPECIALTY POLYMERS USA [US]) [Y] 5, 6, 15, 16 * entire document * | by applicant | US4430384 | US6100474 | US6337442 | US2012080970 |