EP3792298 - SOLID DISPERSION, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, CHAIN-EXTENDED POLYURETHANE USING SAME, AND EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samyang Corporation 31, Jong-ro 33-gil Jongno-gu Seoul 03129 / KR | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Gwang Seok 201-1303, 40, Musamji-ro, Deokjin-gu Jeonju-si Jeollabuk-do 55021 / KR | 02 /
RYU, Hoon 108-504, 30, Dunsannam-ro Seo-gu Daejeon 35235 / KR | 03 /
IM, Jun Seop 2421-501, 15, Dongtansunhwan-daero 17-gil Hwaseong-si Gyeonggi-do 18496 / KR | 04 /
YOO, Seung Hyun 102-1005, 11, Dosan-ro Seo-gu Daejeon 35401 / KR | 05 /
JEON, Won Hyun 13, Gaebong-ro 1ga-gil Guro-gu Seoul 08353 / KR | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Wohlfahrt, Jan Günther, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19800062.2 | 10.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019KR05643 | Priority number, date | KR20180054295 | 11.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180054295 | KR20180057683 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180057683 | KR20180058790 | 24.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180058790 | [2021/11] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019216700 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792298 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/09, C08G59/40, C09D7/45, C09D11/03, C08G18/08, C08G18/10, B01F23/00 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
C08G18/4854 (EP);
C08L75/08 (EP,US);
C08G18/0866 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/7671 (EP);
C08J3/09 (EP);
C08J3/095 (US);
C08K3/042 (EP,US);
C08K5/053 (EP);
C08K5/1535 (EP);
C08K5/17 (EP);
C08K5/3445 (EP);
C08L63/00 (US);
C08L71/02 (EP);
C09K23/00 (EP,US);
C09K23/002 (EP);
C08J2301/02 (US);
C08J2363/00 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (EP);
C08J2375/08 (US);
C08J2401/02 (US);
C08J2463/00 (US);
C08J2475/08 (US);
C08L2205/16 (US);
C09K23/16 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/3206 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/3218 (EP);
C08K3/042, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K3/042, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08K5/053, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08K5/1535, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K5/1535, C08L75/08 (EP);
C08K5/17, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08K5/3445, C08L63/00 (EP);
C08L71/02, C08K3/042 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/11] | C08J3/09, C08G59/40, C08L63/00, B01F17/00, C09D7/45, C09D11/03, C08G18/08, C08G18/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | FESTE DISPERSION, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, KETTENVERLÄNGERTES POLYURETHAN DAMIT UND EPOXIDHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG DAMIT | [2021/11] | English: | SOLID DISPERSION, PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, CHAIN-EXTENDED POLYURETHANE USING SAME, AND EPOXY RESIN COMPOSITION COMPRISING SAME | [2021/11] | French: | DISPERSION SOLIDE, PROCÉDÉ POUR SA PRÉPARATION, POLYURÉTHANE À CHAÎNE ÉTENDUE L'UTILISANT ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ÉPOXY LA COMPRENANT | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2020 | Translation filed | 11.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008077120 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 11,12 * page 3, lines 14-19; examples 3-4; table 1 * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 18 * * page 28, lines 11-18 * * page 29, line 24 - page 30, line 20 ** page 30, line 23 - page 31, line 23 *; | [XP]WO2018089638 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [XP] 11,12 * examples 1-3; claims 1-18 * | International search | [XYA]KR19990073761 (DAEWOONG PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.) [X] 1,4-11 * See page 3, lines 20-23, lines 25-26, lines 29-39. * [Y] 2-3,16-19 [A] 12-15; | [Y]JP2001049187 (GE TOSHIBA SILICONES CO LTD) [Y] 16-19 * See claims 1, 9: paragraphs [0051], [0055]. *; | [Y]JP2004066235 (BYK CHEM GMBH) [Y] 16-19 * See claim 1; paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0039]. *; | [A]JP2006007491 (OJI PAPER CO) [A] 1-19 * See the entire document. *; | [A]KR100622336B (ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKIKAISHA) [A] 1-19 * See the entire document *; | [Y]KR20140026304 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2-3 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0037]. *; | [A]JP2015113426 (ASAHI KASEI E MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-19* See the entire document. *; | [A]KR20170082565 (CLARIANT PLASTICS & COATINGS LTD [CH]) [A] 1-19 * See the entire document. * | by applicant | KR20130023254 | KR20130096307 |