EP3694042 - LITHIUM METAL SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING IMPROVED SAFETY AND BATTERY MODULE INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/33] | LITHIUM METAL SECONDARY BATTERY WITH IMPROVED SAFETY, AND BATTERY MODULE INCLUDING SAME | ||
[2023/36] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute Of Science And Technology 291 Daehak-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon, 34141 / KR | [2022/13] |
Former [2022/03] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | ||
For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute Of Science And Technology 291 Daehak-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon, 34141 / KR | |||
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | ||
For all designated states Korea Advanced Institute Of Science And Technology 291 Daehak-ro, Yuseong-gu Daejeon, 34141 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOON, Jong-Keon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
WOO, Kyung-Hwa LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Hyun-Jun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Hye-Jin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
HAH, Hoe-Jin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Hee-Tak 101-1302, 208, Gwiin-ro, Dongan-gu Anyang-Si, Gyeonggi-do 14103 / KR | 07 /
ROH, Young-Il 104-1301, 33, Beomeo-ro, Mulgeum-eup Yangsan-Si, Gyeongsangnam-do 50609 / KR | 08 /
JIN, Hyun-Soo 118-1304, 50, Arisu-ro 50-gil, Gangdong-Gu Seoul 05229 / KR | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/33] | Application number, filing date | 19800698.3 | 10.05.2019 | [2020/33] | WO2019KR05667 | Priority number, date | KR20180053846 | 10.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180053846 | [2020/33] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019216713 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3694042 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3694042 | Date: | 13.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/058, H01M10/42, H01M10/052, H01M10/0567, H01M4/134, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M50/46 | [2021/14] | CPC: |
H01M4/366 (EP);
H01M50/414 (KR);
H01M10/4235 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0563 (KR);
H01M10/0565 (US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,KR);
H01M10/058 (KR);
H01M4/134 (EP,KR);
H01M4/137 (US);
H01M4/382 (EP);
H01M50/431 (KR);
H01M50/449 (KR);
H01M50/46 (EP,US);
H01M50/463 (KR);
H01M50/489 (KR);
H01M50/491 (KR);
H01M2004/027 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/33] | H01M10/058, H01M10/42, H01M10/052, H01M10/0567, H01M2/10, H01M4/134 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LITHIUM-METALL-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT VERBESSERTER SICHERHEIT UND BATTERIEMODUL DAMIT | [2020/33] | English: | LITHIUM METAL SECONDARY BATTERY HAVING IMPROVED SAFETY AND BATTERY MODULE INCLUDING SAME | [2023/36] | French: | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À METAL LITHIUM AYANT SÉCURITÉ AMÉLIORÉE, ET MODULE DE BATTERIE LA CONTENANT | [2023/36] |
Former [2020/33] | LITHIUM METAL SECONDARY BATTERY WITH IMPROVED SAFETY, AND BATTERY MODULE INCLUDING SAME | ||
Former [2020/33] | BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À MÉTAL LITHIUM DOTÉE D'UNE SÉCURITÉ AMÉLIORÉE, ET MODULE DE BATTERIE LA CONTENANT | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2020 | Translation filed | 05.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 13.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.2023 | CZ | 13.09.2023 | EE | 13.09.2023 | FI | 13.09.2023 | HR | 13.09.2023 | IT | 13.09.2023 | LT | 13.09.2023 | LV | 13.09.2023 | NL | 13.09.2023 | RO | 13.09.2023 | RS | 13.09.2023 | SK | 13.09.2023 | SM | 13.09.2023 | NO | 13.12.2023 | GR | 14.12.2023 | IS | 13.01.2024 | PT | 15.01.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/23] | AT | 13.09.2023 | |
CZ | 13.09.2023 | ||
EE | 13.09.2023 | ||
FI | 13.09.2023 | ||
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RO | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SK | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
PT | 15.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
SM | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
IS | 13.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
NL | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
HR | 13.09.2023 | ||
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
LV | 13.09.2023 | ||
RS | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 13.09.2023 | |
LT | 13.09.2023 | ||
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 13.09.2023 | |
NO | 13.12.2023 | ||
GR | 14.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004058232 (KIM YONG-TAE [KR], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraphs [0020] - [0028]; example 1; claims 1,3 * | International search | [Y]US2014170478 (LIAO ZHAOHUI [US], et al) [Y] 6; | [XY]KR20150062084 (ORANGE POWER LTD [KR]) [X] 1-4 [Y] 5-10; | [A]KR20150106253 (KOREA ADVANCED INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1-10; | [A]JP5867731B (ZEON CORPORATION)[A] 1-10; | [Y]KR20170126404 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 5, 7-10 | by applicant | KR20180053846 |