EP4035285 - SUPER-SYMBOL SIGNALING IN OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Wei-Ren 645 Kiowa Circle San Jose, US 95123 / US | 02 /
CUI, Yan 239 Peppermint Tree Terrace, Unit 4 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 03 /
BAI, Yusheng 24238 Summerhill Avenue Los Altos Hills, California 94024 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 19801169.4 | 22.10.2019 | [2022/31] | WO2019US57323 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021080564 | Date: | 29.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4035285 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00, H04B10/516, H04L27/34 | [2022/31] | CPC: |
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04B10/541 (EP,US);
H04B10/616 (EP,US);
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/0045 (EP,US);
H04L1/0058 (EP);
H04L27/34 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | SUPERSYMBOLSIGNALISIERUNG IN OPTISCHEN KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMEN | [2022/31] | English: | SUPER-SYMBOL SIGNALING IN OPTICAL COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS | [2022/31] | French: | SIGNALISATION PAR SUPER-SYMBOLES DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE COMMUNICATIONS OPTIQUES | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 28.04.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US9673907 (VASSILIEVA OLGA [US], et al); | [IAY]CN108494719 (UNIV BEIJING POSTS & TELECOMM); |