EP4055838 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING SYSTEM, AND HEARING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.05.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sivantos Pte. Ltd. 18 Tai Seng Street No. 08-08 18 Tai Seng Singapore 539775 / SG | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEST, Sebastian Hindenburgstr. 48 91054 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
PILGRIM, Thomas Schillerstr. 71 91054 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
WILSON, Cecil Geschwister-Scholl-Str. 3 91058 Erlangen / DE | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 19801504.2 | 04.11.2019 | [2022/37] | WO2019EP80089 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021089108 | Date: | 14.05.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4055838 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H03G3/32, H03G7/00, H03G9/00, H03G9/18 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
H04R25/356 (EP);
H03G3/32 (EP);
H03G7/002 (EP);
H03G7/007 (EP);
H03G9/005 (EP);
H03G9/18 (EP);
H04R2225/41 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/37] | H04R25/00, H03G3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES HÖRSYSTEMS SOWIE HÖRSYSTEM | [2022/37] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A HEARING SYSTEM, AND HEARING SYSTEM | [2022/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME AUDITIF ET SYSTÈME AUDITIF | [2022/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/37] | 02.03.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US6198830 (HOLUBE INGA [DE], et al); | [IDA]US7773763 (PEDERSEN BRIAN DAM [DK]); | [XAI]EP2908550 (OTICON AS [DK]); | [I]US2016112811 (JENSEN JESPER [DK], et al); | [XAI]US2016381468 (PETRAUSCH STEFAN [DE], et al); | [E]WO2019215200 (SIVANTOS PTE LTD [SG], et al); | by applicant | DE102005061000 | US7773763 | DE102010041740 |