EP3873376 - SYRINGE DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc. 221 W. Philadelphia Street, Suite 60 W. York, PA 17401 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOTTON, Vincent 21333 E. 104th Street Broken Arrow, Oklahoma 74014 / US | 02 /
WILKINSON, Kevin 9131 E 119th St S Bixby, Oklahoma 74008 / US | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/36] | 01 /
SHOTTON, Vincent 21333 E. 104th Street Broken Arrow, Oklahoma 74014 / US | ||
02 /
WILKINSON, Kevin 9131 E 119th St S Bixby, Oklahoma 74008 / US | Representative(s) | Pichova, Vanda Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Corporate Legal Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2023/31] |
Former [2021/36] | Dietz, Mirko Sirona Dental Systems GmbH Fabrikstraße 31 64625 Bensheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 19802017.4 | 28.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US58250 | Priority number, date | US201816174327 | 30.10.2018 Original published format: US201816174327 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092186 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873376 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3873376 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61C5/50, A61C17/02 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61C5/50 (EP,US);
A61C17/0202 (US);
A61C1/0023 (US);
A61C17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZENSPENDER | [2021/36] | English: | SYRINGE DISPENSER | [2021/36] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR DE SERINGUE | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 04.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | MC | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | RS | 02.08.2023 | SI | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | SM | 02.08.2023 | LU | 28.10.2023 | BE | 31.10.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/30] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
LU | 28.10.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
MC | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
EE | 02.08.2023 | ||
ES | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SK | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
SM | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RS | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [IY]US3764115 (BUCKINGHAM R, et al) [I] 1-5 * column 1 - column 6; figures 1-7 * [Y] 6; | [A]US4108177 (PISTOR MICHEL LOUIS PAUL) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0909590 (ZWINGENBERGER ARTHUR [CH]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1072232 (ZWINGENBERGER ARTHUR [CH]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [YA]US2010063447 (STEMPFLE JULIUS [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0025]; figures 4, 5 * [A] 1-5; | [A]US2015157802 (YOON SUNG TAE [KR]) [A] 1-6 * page 1 - page 4; figures 1-5 *; | [A]KR200480998Y (YCELLBIO MEDICAL CO LTD) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0909590 | KR200480998Y | by applicant | US5006112 | US5876380 | US6932242 |