EP3794677 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MINIATURIZED CELL TOWER ANTENNA ARRAYS AND HIGHLY DIRECTIONAL ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states American Antenna Company, LLC 25 S. Rue San Antonio, TX 78217 / US | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYLES, Ralph E. JR. 25 S. Rue San Antonio, Texas 78217 / US | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19802722.9 | 20.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019US33095 | Priority number, date | US201862673682P | 18.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862673682 P | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019222735 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794677 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/24, H01Q15/02, H01Q15/08, H01Q19/06, H01Q21/06, H01Q25/00, H04W88/08, H01Q1/24, // H01Q21/20, H01Q21/28 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
H01Q15/08 (EP,US);
H01Q3/245 (EP,US);
H01Q1/246 (EP,US);
H01Q19/06 (EP,US);
H01Q21/20 (EP,US);
H01Q25/007 (EP,US);
H01Q21/28 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | H01Q3/24, H01Q15/02, H01Q15/08, H01Q19/06, H01Q21/06, H01Q25/00, H04W88/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR MINIATURISIERTE ZELLENTURMGRUPPENANTENNE UND HOCHDIREKTIONALE ELEKTRONISCHE KOMMUNIKATION | [2021/12] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MINIATURIZED CELL TOWER ANTENNA ARRAYS AND HIGHLY DIRECTIONAL ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION | [2021/12] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR RÉSEAUX D'ANTENNES À TOUR CELLULAIRE MINIATURISÉE ET COMMUNICATION ÉLECTRONIQUE HAUTEMENT DIRECTIVE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 25.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011215968 (LE COMTE DAVID [AU], et al) [Y] 10, 11 * ; FIG. 3, paragraphs [0154], [0163]-[0165] *; | [Y]US2012034952 (LO TITUS [US], et al) [Y] 8, 10, 12-19 * ; paragraph [0051] *; | [Y]US2015200450 (HAYLES RALPH E [US], et al) [Y] 20* ; FIG. 1, paragraphs [0019]-[0022] *; | [XY]US2017324171 (SHEHAN JOSHUA W [US]) [X] 1-7, 9 * ; FIG. 1, paragraphs [0030]-[0031], [0036], [0037], [0039], [0066], claim 1 * [Y] 8, 10-20 | by applicant | GB1366259 | DE4430832 | US2004263421 | US2014139370 | WO2017119223 | US2017324171 |