EP3796508 - MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND POWER STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO Electric Co., Ltd. 1-1, Sanyo-cho Daito-shi Osaka 574-8534 / JP | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Masato c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiomo 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
MUKAE, Hidetsugu c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiomo 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Yousuke c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiomo 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Masanori c/o Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiomo 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Vigand, Philippe, et al Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex - Genève / CH | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19803344.1 | 05.04.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019JP15094 | Priority number, date | JP20180093226 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018093226 | [2021/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019220804 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796508 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3796508 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/02, B60L58/22 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H02J7/0016 (EP,US);
B60L58/22 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M10/425 (US);
H01M10/441 (EP,US);
H01M10/48 (EP,US);
H01M10/482 (EP,US);
H02J7/00308 (US);
H02J7/0047 (EP,US);
B60L2240/547 (EP);
B60L2240/80 (EP);
H01M2010/4271 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | H02J7/00, H01M10/44, H01M10/48, H02J7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND ENERGIESPEICHERSYSTEM | [2021/12] | English: | MANAGEMENT DEVICE AND POWER STORAGE SYSTEM | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE GESTION ET SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2020 | Translation filed | 29.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010066379 (IIDA TAKUMA [JP]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0034] - [0127] *; | [A]US2012025769 (KIKUCHI MUTSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] - [0378] *; | [A]WO2015020084 (FDK CORP [JP]) [A] 1-5* abstract *; | [A]US2015303728 (MIURA HIKARU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] - [0100] * | International search | [A]JP2006020382 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG) [A] 1-5* , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008178186 (PANASONIC EV ENERGY CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2009017657 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014171379 (SUMITOMO CONSTR MACHINERY MFG) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2015011801 (HITACHI AUTOMOTIVE SYSTEMS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2016197115 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2017175705 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [A] 1-5 * , entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2011115015 |