EP3870131 - ACTIVE COMPRESSION-DECOMPRESSION DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zoll Circulation, Inc. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2022/09] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states Zoll Circulation, Inc. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | ||
For all designated states Reynolds, Byron J. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | |||
For all designated states Lawrence, David Trevor 142 Kittoe Dr., Unit B Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
For all designated states Giacometti, Paolo 23 Amherst Street North Grafton, MA 01536 / US | |||
For all designated states Freeman, Gary A. 185 Crescent Apt. 23 Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US | |||
For all designated states Prestezog, Anna Grace 442 Leota Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | |||
For all designated states Manoukian, Ari 415 Lotus Ln Mountain View, California 94043 / US | |||
For all designated states Helkowski, Richard A. 80 Fox Hollow Lane Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | |||
For all designated states Harris, Melanie Lynn 779 Laurie Ave Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | |||
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states ZOLL Circulation, Inc. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | ||
For all designated states Reynolds, Byron J. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, CA 95131 / US | |||
For all designated states Lawrence, David Trevor 142 Kittoe Dr., Unit B Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | |||
For all designated states Perez Paolo Giacometti 23 Amherst Street North Grafton, MA 01536 / US | |||
For all designated states Freeman, Gary A. 185 Crescent Apt. 23 Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US | |||
For all designated states Prestezog, Anna Grace 442 Leota Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | |||
For all designated states Manoukian, Ari 415 Lotus Ln Mountain View, California 94043 / US | |||
For all designated states Helkowski, Richard A. 80 Fox Hollow Lane Redwood City, CA 94062 / US | |||
For all designated states Harris, Melanie Lynn 779 Laurie Ave Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYNOLDS, Byron J. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, California 95131 / US | 02 /
LAWRENCE, David Trevor 142 Kittoe Dr. Unit B Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
GIACOMETTI, Paolo 23 Amherst Street North Grafton, Massachusetts 01536 / US | 04 /
FREEMAN, Gary A. 185 Crescent Street Apt. 423 Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US | 05 /
PRESTEZOG, Anna Grace 442 Leota Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 06 /
MANOUKIAN, Ari 415 Lotus Ln Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 07 /
HELKOWSKI, Richard A. 80 Fox Hollow Lane Redwood City, California 94062 / US | 08 /
HARRIS, Melanie Lynn 779 Laurie Ave Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | 01 /
REYNOLDS, Byron J. 2000 Ringwood Avenue San Jose, California 95131 / US | ||
02 /
LAWRENCE, David Trevor 142 Kittoe Dr. Unit B Mountain View, California 94043 / US | |||
03 /
PEREZ, Paolo Giacometti 23 Amherst Street North Grafton, Massachusetts 01536 / US | |||
04 /
FREEMAN, Gary A. 185 Crescent Street Apt. 423 Waltham, Massachusetts 02453 / US | |||
05 /
PRESTEZOG, Anna Grace 442 Leota Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | |||
06 /
MANOUKIAN, Ari 415 Lotus Ln Mountain View, California 94043 / US | |||
07 /
HELKOWSKI, Richard A. 80 Fox Hollow Lane Redwood City, California 94062 / US | |||
08 /
HARRIS, Melanie Lynn 779 Laurie Ave Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 19804904.1 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019US57371 | Priority number, date | US201862749035P | 22.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862749035 P | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020086538 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870131 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61H31/00, A61H11/00 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A61H31/006 (EP,US);
A61H11/00 (EP);
A61H31/005 (US);
A61H31/008 (EP,US);
A61H2011/005 (US);
A61H2031/001 (US);
A61H2031/003 (US);
A61H2201/149 (EP);
A61H2201/5007 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | AKTIVE KOMPRESSIONS-DEKOMPRESSIONS-VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2021/35] | English: | ACTIVE COMPRESSION-DECOMPRESSION DEVICES AND METHODS | [2021/35] | French: | DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS ACTIFS DE COMPRESSION-DÉCOMPRESSION | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 17.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6090056 (BYSTROM STEVEN R [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15-21,27-30,44,54,108-111,136 * the whole document *; | [X]EP3308763 (MEDIANA CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-12,15-21,27-30,44,54,108-111,136 * the whole document *; | [X]US2018133103 (LURIE KEITH G [US]) [X] 1-12,15-21,27-30,44,54,108-111,136* the whole document * |