EP3852683 - TRANSCATHETER PULMONIC REGENERATIVE VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHANG, Hao Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | 02 /
CAMPBELL, Louis A. Edwards Lifesciences One Edwards Way Legal Department Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Smith, Jeremy Robert, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19805039.5 | 28.10.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019US58292 | Priority number, date | US201862754102P | 01.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862754102 P | [2021/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092205 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3852683 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3852683 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
A61F2/2412 (EP);
A61F2/2418 (US);
A61F2/2433 (US);
A61F2/2436 (US);
A61L27/3633 (US);
A61L27/54 (US);
A61L31/041 (US);
A61L31/148 (US);
A61F2002/0081 (US);
A61F2210/0004 (US);
A61F2220/0008 (US);
A61F2250/001 (US);
A61F2250/0031 (EP);
A61F2250/0039 (US);
A61F2250/0067 (US);
A61L2430/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PULMONALES REGENERATIVES TRANSKATHETERVENTIL | [2021/30] | English: | TRANSCATHETER PULMONIC REGENERATIVE VALVE | [2021/30] | French: | VALVE RÉGÉNÉRATIVE PULMONAIRE TRANSCATHÉTER | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9640012 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US]); | [Y]US2014249623 (MATHENY ROBERT [US]); | [XAYI]US2014330370 (MATHENY ROBERT G [US], et al); | [Y]US2016175095 (DIENNO DUSTIN V [US], et al) | by applicant | US5411522 | US6666886 | US6730118 | US9393110 | US9657265 |