EP3880316 - PHYSICAL TRAINING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kynett Holding B.V. Larenseweg 49 7241 CM Lochem / NL | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEGEMAN, Gerrit Jan 9, Molendijk 7245 NE LAREN / NL | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19805419.9 | 11.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019NL50735 | Priority number, date | NL20182022002 | 15.11.2018 Original published format: NL 2022002 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101483 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880316 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/22, A63B21/00, A63B21/04 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
A63B21/227 (EP,US);
A63B21/00061 (EP,US);
A63B21/153 (EP,US);
A63B21/16 (EP,US);
A63B21/4035 (EP,US);
A63B21/4043 (EP);
A63B23/03508 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG FÜR KÖRPERLICHES TRAINING | [2021/38] | English: | PHYSICAL TRAINING APPARATUS | [2021/38] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENTRAÎNEMENT PHYSIQUE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 24.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 24.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 24.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.02.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE102011105609 (EISENBLAETTER GERD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,13,16 * paragraphs [0043] , [0045] , [0049] , [0056] , [0057] , [0058] , [0060] * * figures 1,3,4 * [I] 17,18; | [XI]WO2018203311 (DESMOTEC S R L [IT]) [X] 1-3,13,16 * page 10, line 17 - line 18 * * figures 5,6,11 * * page 15, paragraph last *[I] 17,18 | by applicant | US518967 | DE9205777U |