EP3863738 - COACHING, ASSESSING OR ANALYSING UNSEEN PROCESSES IN INTERMITTENT HIGH-SPEED HUMAN MOTIONS, INCLUDING GOLF SWINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mooney, Brian Francis 7 Oakwood, Tivoli Road Dun Laoghaire County Dublin A96 YY01 / IE | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | MacLachlan & Donaldson Unit 10, 4075 Kingswood Road Citywest Business Campus Dublin D24 C56E / IE | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19805537.8 | 09.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP77387 | Priority number, date | IE2018S000320 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: IE S20180320 | IE2018S000513 | 04.12.2018 Original published format: IE S20180513 | IE2019S000062 | 18.04.2019 Original published format: IE S20190062 | IE2019S000107 | 02.07.2019 Original published format: IE S20190107 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074596 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863738 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A63B24/00, G06K9/00 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
G06F18/00 (EP);
A63B24/0006 (US);
A63B71/0622 (US);
G06V40/23 (US);
A63B2024/0009 (US);
A63B2024/0012 (US);
A63B2102/32 (US);
A63B2220/05 (US);
A63B2220/24 (US);
A63B2220/30 (US);
A63B2220/40 (US);
A63B2220/53 (US);
A63B2220/807 (US);
A63B2220/833 (US);
A63B2220/836 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | COACHING, BEWERTUNG ODER ANALYSE UNSICHTBARER PROZESSE BEI INTERMITTIERENDEN, SEHR SCHNELLEN MENSCHLICHEN BEWEGUNGEN, EINSCHLIESSLICH GOLFSCHLÄGEN | [2021/33] | English: | COACHING, ASSESSING OR ANALYSING UNSEEN PROCESSES IN INTERMITTENT HIGH-SPEED HUMAN MOTIONS, INCLUDING GOLF SWINGS | [2021/33] | French: | ENTRAÎNEMENT, ÉVALUATION OU ANALYSE DE PROCESSUS NON VUS DANS DES MOUVEMENTS HUMAINS RAPIDES INTERMITTENTS, Y COMPRIS DES ÉLANS DE GOLF | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.07.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 23.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/12] | Request for further processing for: | 23.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013041444 (MOONEY BRIAN FRANCIS [IE]) [X] 1-120 * abstract * * page 4, line 6 - page 70, line 21; figures 1-25 *; | [A]US9623284 (LAFORTUNE MARIO A [US], et al) [A] 1-120 * abstract ** columns 2-28; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | WO2009060011 | WO2013041444 |