EP3798241 - CATALYST COMPONENT FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND CATALYST INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation 22A Chaoyangmenbei Street Chaoyang District Beijing 100728 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Research Institute of Chemical Industry, China Petroleum & Chemical Corporation No. 14, Beisanhuan East Road Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Rui No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 02 /
TAN, Zhong No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 03 /
ZHOU, Qilong No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 04 /
XU, Xiudong No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 05 /
LI, Fengkui No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 06 /
YIN, Shanshan No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 07 /
YU, Jinhua No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | 08 /
SONG, Weiwei No.14, Beisanhuan East Road, Chaoyang District Beijing 100013 / CN | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19807100.3 | 21.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019CN87787 | Priority number, date | CN201810489139 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810489139 | CN201810489207 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810489207 | CN201810489282 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810489282 | [2021/13] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019223683 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3798241 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/649, C08F4/654, C08F10/00, C08F110/06, C08F4/651, C08F10/06 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
C08F10/06 (EP);
C08F10/00 (KR);
B01J21/063 (US);
B01J31/143 (US);
C08F110/02 (KR,US);
C08F110/06 (KR,US);
C08F2/06 (US);
C08F4/649 (KR,US);
C08F4/651 (KR);
C08F4/654 (KR);
C08F6/003 (US);
C08F6/02 (US);
C08F2410/02 (EP);
C08F2410/03 (US);
C08F4/6143 (US);
C08F4/6494 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/06, C08F4/651 (EP);
C08F10/06, C08F4/6548 (EP);
C08F110/06, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/04, C08F2500/15 (EP);
C08F210/06, C08F210/16, C08F2500/18, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/15, C08F2500/27 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | KATALYSATORBESTANDTEIL ZUR OLEFINPOLYMERISATION, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND KATALYSATOR DAMIT | [2021/13] | English: | CATALYST COMPONENT FOR OLEFIN POLYMERIZATION, PREPARATION METHOD THEREOF, AND CATALYST INCLUDING SAME | [2021/13] | French: | CONSTITUANT CATALYTIQUE POUR LA POLYMÉRISATION D'OLÉFINES, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION ASSOCIÉ ET CATALYSEUR LE COMPRENANT | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | Translation filed | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 08.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN101643519 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL); | [A]CN102276765 ; | [A]CN103012625 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [A]CN103012627 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [A]CN103012632 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [A]CN103012631 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [A]CN103012626 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [A]US9068026 (XIA XIANZHI [CN], et al); | [XA]US9587049 (TAFTAF MANSOUR I [US], et al); | [A]CN106608933 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al); | [A]CN106608937 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al) | International search | [A]JP2001114811 (IDEMITSU PETROCHEMICAL CO); | [A]WO2005077990 (RELIANCE IND LTD [IN], et al); | [X]CN101643519 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL); | [A]CN102234337 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [X]CN102276765 ; | [A]CN102372797 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [X]CN103012625 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [X]CN103012627 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [X]CN103012632 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [X]CN103012631 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [X]CN103012626 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEMICAL, et al); | [A]CN104204001 (SAUDI BASIC INDUSTRY CORP); | [A]RU2580822 (CHAJNA PETROLEUM END KEMIKL CORP [CN], et al); | [X]CN106608933 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al); | [X]CN106608937 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al) | by applicant | CN1020448C | CN101864009 | CN101906177 | CN102276765 | CN102311513 | CN102603931 | CN103012625 | CN103012626 | CN103012627 | CN106317274 | CN106317275 | CN106608933 |