EP3797921 - LASER WELDED LAP JOINT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING LASER-WELDED LAP JOINT, AND STRUCTURAL COMPONENT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARA Asato c/o Intellectual Property Dept., JFE STEEL CORPORATION, 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | 02 /
KITANI Yasushi c/o Intellectual Property Dept., JFE STEEL CORPORATION, 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda- ku Tokyo 100-0011 / JP | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19808127.5 | 20.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019JP19838 | Priority number, date | JP20180096824 | 21.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018096824 | [2021/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019225528 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797921 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/244, B23K26/28, B23K26/32, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/18 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
C22C38/02 (EP);
B23K26/21 (KR);
B23K26/244 (EP,KR,US);
B23K26/0626 (US);
B23K26/28 (EP,KR);
B23K26/32 (EP);
C22C38/04 (EP,KR);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/18 (EP);
C22C38/38 (KR);
B23K2101/006 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | B23K26/244, B23K26/21, B23K26/28, C22C38/00, C22C38/04, C22C38/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | LASERGESCHWEISSTER ÜBERLAPPSTOSS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES LASERGESCHWEISSTEN ÜBERLAPPSTOSSES UND STRUKTURKOMPONENTE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2021/13] | English: | LASER WELDED LAP JOINT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING LASER-WELDED LAP JOINT, AND STRUCTURAL COMPONENT FOR MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/13] | French: | JOINT DE RECOUVREMENT SOUDÉ AU LASER, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN JOINT DE RECOUVREMENT SOUDÉ AU LASER, ET ÉLÉMENT STRUCTURAL POUR VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2020 | Translation filed | 04.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 04.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]DE19627913 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [I] 1-8* figure -; claim 1 * | International search | [Y]JP2017030647 (JFE STEEL CORP) [Y] 1-8* , paragraphs [0033]-[0035], [0043], fig. 5 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2017159425 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0127], fig. 1-5 * | by applicant | JP2008296236 | JP2009154194 | JP2012240083 | JP2012240086 | JP2017113781 |