EP3898706 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING HNBR SOLUTIONS WITH ALTERNATIVE SOLVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARLANXEO Deutschland GmbH Alte Heerstrasse 2 41540 Dormagen / DE | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHNEIDERS, Karola Fauthstraße 25 51465 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 02 /
LIEBER, Susanna Meißener Straße 1 67663 Kaiserslautern / DE | 03 /
DAVID, Sarah Castellstraße 10 41539 Dormagen / DE | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19808596.1 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP82538 | Priority number, date | EP20180213114 | 17.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18213114 | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020126345 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3898706 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/02, C08F236/12, B01J31/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
C08C19/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08F236/12 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/2265 (EP);
C08F2/06 (KR,US);
C08F4/70 (KR);
C08F4/80 (US);
C08F8/06 (KR);
B01J2231/643 (EP);
B01J2231/645 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F236/12, C08F2/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HNBR-LÖSUNGEN MIT ALTERNATIVEN LÖSUNGSMITTELN | [2021/43] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING HNBR SOLUTIONS WITH ALTERNATIVE SOLVENTS | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE SOLUTIONS DE HNBR AVEC DES SOLVANTS ALTERNATIFS | [2021/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]CN104140479 ; | [A]CN107308985 ; | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2015, no. 05, Database accession no. 2015-04822V, XP002791659 & CN104140479 A 20141112 (PETROCHINA CO LTD) [X] 1-3,7-9,12 * abstract * [A] 4-6,10,11,13,14 | [A] - AI CHUNJIN ET AL, "Selectively catalytic hydrogenation of nitrile-butadiene rubber using Grubbs II catalyst", MACROMOLECULAR RESEARCH, POLYMER SOCIETY OF KOREA, SEOUL, KR, vol. 25, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S13233-017-5058-0, ISSN 1598-5032, (20170603), pages 461 - 465, (20170603), XP036250230 [A] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13233-017-5058-0 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2017, no. 81, Database accession no. 2017-76482S, XP002791660 & CN107308985 A 20171103 (UNIV FUZHOU) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | DE2539132 | EP0471250 | EP0588097 | WO9604289 | WO9706185 | US2002107138 | WO02100941 | WO02100905 | WO03011455 | US6683136 | EP1405840 | WO2004035596 | EP1862477 | EP2027920 | WO2012175725 | WO2013056400 | WO2013057295 | WO2013057285 | WO2013057286 | WO2013160470 | WO2013190371 | WO2013190373 | CN104140479 | WO2014198658 | WO2016166097 | DE102015225719 | CN107308985 | US2018053932 | - J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20070000), vol. 129, pages 4168 - 4169 | - CHUNJIN AI et al., "Selectively Catalytic Hydrogenation of Nitrile-Butadiene Rubber Using Grubbs II Catalyst", Macromolecular Research, (20170000), vol. 25, no. 5, doi:10.1007/s13233-017-5058-0, pages 461 - 465, XP036250230 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s13233-017-5058-0 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methoden der Organischen Chemie [Methods of Organic Chemistry, Georg Thieme Verlag, (19610000), vol. 14/1, page 30 | - Rompp Lexikon der Chemie [Rompp's Chemistry Lexicon, (19970000), vol. 2 | - H. GERRENS, Fortschr. Hochpolym. Forsch., (19590000), vol. 1, page 234 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20030000), vol. 42, page 4592 | - Eur. J. Org. Chem, (20030000), pages 963 - 966 | - Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20020000), vol. 41, page 4038 | - J. Org. Chem., (20040000), vol. 69, pages 6894 - 96 | - Chem. Eur. J, (20040000), vol. 10, pages 777 - 784 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Database accession no. 246047-72-3 |