EP3871238 - BALLISTIC UNIPOLAR BISTABLE ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moving Magnet Technologies ZAC La Fayette 1, rue Christiaan Huygens 25000 Besançon / FR | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOUSSERT, Guillaume 52, rue Jeanne-Antide Thouret 25000 Besançon / FR | 02 /
BIWERSI, Stéphane 2 rue de la Velle 25140 Frambouhans / FR | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | IP Trust 2, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19808628.2 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019FR52441 | Priority number, date | FR20180059948 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: FR 1859948 | [2021/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084220 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3871238 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/122, H01F7/16, H01F7/14, H01F7/18, F16K31/00, H01H51/00 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
H01F7/122 (EP,KR,US);
H01F7/1615 (EP,KR,US);
H01F1/14 (KR,US);
H01F7/14 (EP,US);
H01F7/18 (EP);
H01F7/1844 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | BALLISTISCHER UNIPOLARER BISTABILER AKTUATOR | [2021/35] | English: | BALLISTIC UNIPOLAR BISTABLE ACTUATOR | [2021/35] | French: | ACTIONNEUR BISTABLE UNIPOLAIRE DE TYPE BALISTIQUE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 26.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.08.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.2024 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0340625 (FUCHS FRANZ); | [XYI]DE102009039562 (ETO MAGNETIC GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]FR2951316 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC IND SAS [FR]); | [XYI]DE102010017874 (SAIA BURGESS DRESDEN GMBH [DE]); | [XYI]DE102014113500 (ETO MAGNETIC GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US2002149456 | EP1875480 | DE102014216274 |