EP3895397 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING A CROSS-PROTOCOL MESSAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technische Universität Graz Rechbauerstraße 12 8010 Graz / AT | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Rainer Harmsdorfgasse 44a/1 8010 Graz / AT | 02 /
BOANO, Carlo Alberto Aspasiagasse 2 8010 Graz / AT | 03 /
ROEMER, Kay Uwe Neue-Welt-Hoehe 20 8042 Graz / AT | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Weiser & Voith Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Kopfgasse 7 1130 Wien / AT | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19809115.9 | 02.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019EP83298 | Priority number, date | EP20180212281 | 13.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18212281 | [2021/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020120195 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3895397 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3895397 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L69/08, H04L69/18 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04L69/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/42] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN EINER PROTOKOLLÜBERGREIFENDEN NACHRICHT | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR TRANSMITTING A CROSS-PROTOCOL MESSAGE | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION D'UN MESSAGE INTERPROTOCOLE | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/42] | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION D'UN MESSAGE INTER-PROTOCOLE | Entry into regional phase | 18.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 18.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.07.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.01.2023 | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | PL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/11] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
CZ | 04.01.2023 | ||
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
PL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 04.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018352055 (HE TIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015] ** paragraph [0088] - paragraph [0092] *; | [AD] - KAMESWARI CHEBROLU ET AL, "Esense", NATIONAL LAB FOR INFORMATION SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY/ MOBICOM'09, ACM, BEIJING,CHINA, (20090920), doi:10.1145/1614320.1614330, ISBN 978-1-60558-702-8, pages 85 - 96, XP058288598 [AD] 1-15 * page 85 - page 90 * * Section 4.3 * * Section 4.4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1614320.1614330 | by applicant | - "B2W2: N-Way Concurrent Communication for IoT Devices", CHI Z. et al., Proceedings of the 14th ACM Conference on Embedded Network Sensor Systems, SenSys '16, ACM, (20160000), pages 245 - 258 | - "FreeBee: Cross-Technology Communication via Free Side Channel", KIM S. et al., Proceedings of the 21st Annual International Conference on Mobile Computing and Networking, MobiCom '15, ACM, (20150000), pages 317 - 330 | - "Esense: Communication through energy sensing", CHEBROLU K. et al., Proceedings of the 15th Annual International Conference on Mobile Computing and Networking, MobiCom '09, ACM, (20090900), pages 85 - 96 |