EP3918426 - METHOD FOR TIME-TO-DIGITAL CONVERSION AND TIME-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.08.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GSI Helmholtzzentrum für Schwerionenforschung GmbH Planckstrasse 1 64291 Darmstadt / DE | [2021/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KNITTEL, Günter Celsiusstr. 59 53125 Bonn / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
KNITTEL, Günter 53125 Bonn / DE | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2024/26] |
Former [2021/49] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstraße 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 19809457.5 | 25.11.2019 | [2021/49] | WO2019EP82430 | Priority number, date | DE201910102254 | 30.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019102254 | [2021/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020156701 | Date: | 06.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3918426 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.08.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3918426 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G04F10/00 | [2021/49] | CPC: |
G04F10/005 (EP);
H03K5/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR TIME-TO-DIGITAL-KONVERSION UND TIME-TO-DIGITAL-KONVERTER | [2021/49] | English: | METHOD FOR TIME-TO-DIGITAL CONVERSION AND TIME-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTER | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION TEMPS VERS NUMÉRIQUE ET CONVERTISSEUR TEMPS VERS NUMÉRIQUE | [2024/04] |
Former [2021/49] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONVERSION TEMPS-NUMÉRIQUE ET CONVERTISSEUR TEMPS-NUMÉRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 18.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 18.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0113935 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al); | [XAI]US2017163279 (KINYUA MARTIN [US]) | by applicant | US7809521 | US2011133973 |