EP3802347 - REPAIRABLE PLASTIC PALLET WITH REMOVABLE SUPPORT BLOCKS AND ASSOCIATED METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/15] | REPAIRABLE PLASTIC PALLET WITH REMOVABLE SUPPORT BLOCKS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | ||
[2024/15] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 29 255 George Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | [2023/26] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states CHEP Technology Pty Limited Level 10 Angel Place 123 Pitt Street Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
D'EMIDIO, Brandon Michael 8360 Steeplechase Drive Roswell, Georgia 30076 / US | 02 /
GARCIA, Ricardo Martin 14138 Castlerock Dr. Orlando, Florida 32828 / US | 03 /
GORSKY, Daniel Aaron 256 Countryside Dr. Lebanon, Ohio 45036 / US | 04 /
SIEBERT, Paul J. 3421 Beth Ln. Melbourne, Florida 32934 / US | 05 /
STATES, Robert G., III 3407 Gray Fox Trail Morrow, Ohio 45152 / US | 06 /
BARNSWELL, Paul 102 Via Rosa Court Debary, Florida 32713 / US | 07 /
GAINEY, Joseph Adam 3942 Kilmarnock Dr. Apopka, Florida 32712 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road Holborn London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2024/34] |
Former [2021/15] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19809972.3 | 28.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US34131 | Priority number, date | US201862678402P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678402 P | US201916421677 | 24.05.2019 Original published format: US201916421677 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019231885 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802347 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3802347 | Date: | 21.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/32 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
B65D19/0016 (EP,US);
B65D19/0073 (US);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00069 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00104 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00273 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00288 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00293 (US);
B65D2519/00308 (EP);
B65D2519/00318 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00333 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00373 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00407 (EP);
B65D2519/00412 (EP);
B65D2519/00417 (EP);
B65D2519/00437 (EP);
B65D2519/00442 (EP);
B65D2519/00567 (EP,US);
B65D2519/00791 (EP);
B65D2519/00796 (EP);
B65D2519/0084 (EP);
B65D2519/0099 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | B65D19/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REPARIERBARE KUNSTSTOFFPALETTE MIT ENTFERNBAREN STÜTZBLÖCKEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGES VERFAHREN | [2024/15] | English: | REPAIRABLE PLASTIC PALLET WITH REMOVABLE SUPPORT BLOCKS AND ASSOCIATED METHOD | [2024/15] | French: | PALETTE EN PLASTIQUE RÉPARABLE AVEC BLOCS DE SUPPORT AMOVIBLES ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2024/15] |
Former [2021/15] | REPARIERBARE KUNSTSTOFFPALETTE MIT ABNEHMBAREN TRÄGERBLÖCKEN UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2021/15] | REPAIRABLE PLASTIC PALLET WITH REMOVABLE SUPPORT BLOCKS AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | ||
Former [2021/15] | PALETTE EN PLASTIQUE RÉPARABLE AVEC BLOCS DE SUPPORT AMOVIBLES, ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 12.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010128260 (GEPROM [FR], et al); | [A]CN105539991 (LI JINGYUAN); | [A]WO2018082617 (CHINA MERCHANTS LOSCAM ASIA PACIFIC CO LTD [CN]) | International search | [Y]US5579686 (PIGOTT BRANDON L [US], et al); | [A]US5791261 (JOHN MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]WO9962779 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]); | [Y]US2014137775 (PLATTNER PATRIK [CH]); | [Y]DE102014007079 (SCHOELLER ALLIBERT GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | US4843976 | US5413052 | US5791261 | WO2010128260 | CN105539991 | WO2018082617 |