EP3802343 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MULTI-COMPARTMENT BEVERAGE BOTTLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/15] | MULTI-COMPARTMENT BEVERAGE BOTTLE SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2024/12] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states In Spirit Group, Inc. P.O. Box 33114 Los Angeles CA 90033 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIS, Clifton P.O. Box 33114 Los Angeles, CA 90033 / US | 02 /
SCHWARTZ, Brandon P.O. Box 33114 Los Angeles, CA 90033 / US | 03 /
CISNEROS, Lawrence P.O. Box 33114 Los Angeles, CA 90033 / US | 04 /
LO, Feyats P.O. Box 33114 Los Angeles, CA 90033 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19810803.7 | 31.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US35086 | Priority number, date | US201862679578P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679578 P | US201862770657P | 21.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862770657 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019232499 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802343 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/04, B65D51/28, B65D81/32 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B65D47/242 (EP,KR);
B65D81/3211 (EP,KR,US);
A23L2/52 (KR,US);
B29C45/1676 (KR,US);
B65B29/10 (US);
B65B3/04 (US);
B65B7/168 (US);
B65B7/28 (US);
B65D1/04 (KR,US);
B65D25/06 (KR,US);
B65D25/08 (KR,US);
B65D51/18 (EP,KR,US);
B65D53/02 (KR,US);
B65D83/0027 (KR,US);
C12G3/06 (KR,US);
A23V2002/00 (US);
B29K2021/003 (KR,US);
B29K2023/12 (KR,US);
B29L2031/7158 (KR,US);
B65B2230/02 (US);
B65D2251/0015 (EP,KR,US);
B65D2251/0078 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MEHRKAMMER-GETRÄNKEFLASCHE | [2024/12] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A MULTI-COMPARTMENT BEVERAGE BOTTLE | [2024/12] | French: | MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION D'UNE BOUTEILLE DE BOISSON À PLUSIEURS COMPARTIMENTS | [2024/12] |
Former [2021/15] | MEHRKAMMER-GETRÄNKEFLASCHENSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2021/15] | MULTI-COMPARTMENT BEVERAGE BOTTLE SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2021/15] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR BOUTEILLES DE BOISSONS À PLUSIEURS COMPARTIMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 09.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.11.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2590235 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [YA]US2002185389 (KELDERS JOHANNES [NL], et al) [Y] 8 * the whole document * [A] 7; | [A]US2010072160 (HAYES SCOTT H [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [XAYI]WO2011151834 (SHARON TAL [IL], et al) [X] 1,10,12 * page 11, line 15 - page 15, line 19; figures 4, 5 * [A] 2,11,13-15 [Y] 8 [I] 7,9; | [A]US2013037506 (WAHLSTROM MATTHEW [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US4936446 (LATAIX GILBERT [FR]) [A] 1-20 * ; figures 8-10, ccolumn 7 lines 54-68, column 8 lines 1-24 *; | [A]US5647481 (HUNDERTMARK VOLKER [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; abstract, figures 1, 4, column 4 lines 55-67, column 5 lines 1-15 *; | [XA]US2002185389 (KELDERS JOHANNES [NL], et al) [X] 21 * ; figures 1, 3-4, paragraphs [0021], [0025]-0027] * [A] 1-20, 22-28; | [A]US2004089563 (SHARON IGAL [IL], et al) [A] 1-20, 25-26 * ; abstract, figures 2, 4-6, paragraph [0019], [0030], [0033]-[0034] *; | [A]US2004168436 (ZACCHE VANNI [IT], et al) [A] 22-24 * ; figure 1, paragraph [0010] *; | [A]US2010200437 (COON DARREN [US]) [A] 25-28* ; paragraph [0176] *; | [A]US2015351442 (ZHU YANMING [CN], et al) [A] 22-24 * ; paragraphs [0023]-[0024] *; | [A]KR20170008618 (JUNG SUNG WOOK [KR]) [A] 1-20, 27-28 * ; figure 3, 8b-8d, page 3 paragraph 10, 15-18 * |